EP1159799 - DIGITAL FILE MANAGEMENT AND IMAGING SYSTEM AND METHOD INCLUDING SECURE FILE MARKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Authentidate Holding Corp. 2165 Technology Drive Riverside Technology Park Schenectady, NY 12308 / US | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Bitwise Designs, Inc. 2165 Technology Drive, Riverside Technology Park Schenectady, NY 12308 / US | ||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Bitwise Designs, Inc. 2165 Technology Drive, Riverside Technology Park Schenectady, NY 12308 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORROWMAN, Colin, D. 112 Mercer Avenue Schenectady, NY 12303 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Cabinet Hirsch 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00914752.1 | 24.02.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000US05098 | Priority number, date | US19990259135 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: US 259135 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0051286 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159799 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159799 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
H04L9/3297 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2151 (EP,US);
H04L2209/88 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99942 (US);
Y10S707/99943 (US);
Y10S707/99945 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/49] | H04L9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITALES DATENVERWALTUNGS-UND ABBILDHERSTELLUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT GESICHERTER DATENMARKIERUNG | [2006/09] | English: | DIGITAL FILE MANAGEMENT AND IMAGING SYSTEM AND METHOD INCLUDING SECURE FILE MARKING | [2001/49] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE FICHIERS NUMERIQUES ET D'IMAGERIE INCLUANT LE MARQUAGE SÉCURISÉ DE FICHIERS | [2006/06] |
Former [2001/49] | DIGITALEN DATENVERWALTUNGS-UND BILDFERNUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT GESICHERTER DATENMARKIERUNG | ||
Former [2001/49] | SYSTEME DE GESTION DE FICHIERS NUMERIQUES ET D'IMAGERIE ET PROCEDE COMPRENANT LE MARQUAGE DE FICHIERS SECURISES | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 29.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | BE | 26.07.2006 | CH | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | IT | 26.07.2006 | LI | 26.07.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | LU | 24.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
LI | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0516898 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [X] 1-32 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 34 - line 38 * * column 5, line 36 - line 38 * * column 8, line 48 - line 52 * * claims 2,7,15 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]FR2697960 (EURL PHONYCOM [FR]) [X] 1,2,15,16,26,27 * page 2, line 14 - line 16 * * abstract *[A] 3-14,17-25,28-32 | International search | [Y]US5499294 (FRIEDMAN GARY L [US]); | [Y]US5870471 (WOOTTON JOHN R [US], et al); | [Y]US5875249 (MINTZER FREDERICK COLE [US], et al); | [YP]US5923763 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al); | [YP]US5949879 (BERSON WILLIAM [US], et al) |