EP1167369 - NOVEL THIAZOLOBENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. No. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. No. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHIBE, Satoshi Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 02 /
ITAHANA, Hirotsune Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 03 /
OKADA, Masamichi Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltt., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 04 /
KOHARA, Atsuyuki Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 05 /
MAENO, Kyoichi Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 06 /
YAHIRO, Kiyoshi Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21,Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 07 /
SHIMADA, Itsuro Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21,Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 08 /
TANABE, Kazuhito Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 09 /
NEGORO, Kenji Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 10 /
KAMIKUBO, Takashi Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | 11 /
SAKAMOTO, Shuichi Yamanouchi Pharmac. Co., Ltd., 21, Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8585 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Geering, Keith Edwin REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00915350.3 | 05.04.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000JP02199 | Priority number, date | JP19990099062 | 06.04.1999 Original published format: JP 9906299 | [2002/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0059913 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167369 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/04, A61K31/429, A61K31/5383, A61K31/454, A61K31/4439, A61K31/435, A61P43/00, A61P25/28, A61P9/10, // (C07D513/04, 277:00, 235:00) | [2003/22] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/429 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | C07D513/04, A61K31/429, A61K31/5383, A61K31/454, A61K31/4439, A61K31/435, A61P43/00, A61P25/28, A61P9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE THIAZOLOBENZIMIDAZOL-DERIVATE | [2002/01] | English: | NOVEL THIAZOLOBENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES | [2002/01] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE THIAZOLOBENZIMIDAZOLE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2001 | Translation filed | 29.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/50] | 11.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - J.-P.PIN AND R.DUVOISIN, "The Metabotropic Glutamate Receptors: Structure and Functions", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1995), vol. 34, pages 1 - 26, XP002235912 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(94)00129-G | International search | [X]JPH0377881 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL); | [A]WO9806724 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XP]WO9944639 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) |