EP1094126 - ATMOSPHERIC CORROSION RESISTANT STEEL PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1-28 Kitahonmachidori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Tatsumi Tech. Res. Lab. Kawasaki Ste. Corp Kawasakidori 1-chome Mizushima Kurashiki-shi Okayama 712-8074 / JP | 02 /
SHIOTANI, Kazuhiko Technical Research Laboratories Kawasaki Ste. Corp. Kawasakidori 1-chome Mizushima Kurashiki-shi Okayama 712-8074 / JP | 03 /
KAWABATA, Fumimaru Technical Research Laboratories Kawasaki Ste. Corp. Kawasakidori 1-chome Mizushima Kurashiki-shi Okayama 712-8074 / JP | 04 /
AMANO, Keniti Technical Research Laboratories Kawasaki Ste. Corp. Kawasakidori 1-chome Mizushima Kurashiki-shi Okayama 712-8074 / JP | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/17] | Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00915415.4 | 07.04.2000 | [2001/17] | WO2000JP02274 | Priority number, date | JP19990101743 | 08.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10174399 | JP19990107639 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10763999 | [2001/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0061829 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094126 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/04, C22C38/16, C22C38/00 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/42 (EP,KR);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/004 (EP);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/20 (EP);
C22C38/32 (EP);
C22C38/38 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/34] | C22C38/58, C22C38/04, C22C38/16, C22C38/54 | ||
Former IPC [2001/17] | C22C38/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | STAHLPRODUKT, RESISTENT GEGEN ATMOSPHÄRISCHE KORROSION | [2001/17] | English: | ATMOSPHERIC CORROSION RESISTANT STEEL PRODUCT | [2001/17] | French: | PRODUIT EN ACIER RESISTANT A LA CORROSION ATMOSPHERIQUE | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2000 | Translation filed | 04.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09137218 ; | [X]JPH09316617 ; | [X]JPH08225888 ; | [X]JPH05171265 ; | [X]JPS6052522 ; | [X]EP0528407 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * tables 1-3,5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09137218 A 19970527 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09316617 A 19971209 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08225888 A 19960903 (NKK CORP) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931022), vol. 017, no. 582, Database accession no. (C - 1123), & JP05171265 A 19930709 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850730), vol. 009, no. 184, Database accession no. (C - 294), & JP60052522 A 19850325 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH08225888 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [X]JPH08143954 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]JPS62256947 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JPS52150324 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JPH059570 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) |