EP1095095 - FILM FOR WRAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Du Pont-Mitsui Polychemicals Co., Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2005/46] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Du Pont-Mitsui Polychemicals Co., Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Du Pont-Mitsui Polychemicals Co., Ltd. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6090 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Kenichi 5-3-1, Nishikasai Edogawa-ku, Tokyo 134-0088 / JP | 02 /
KAMIKUZU, Akira 2-5, Yushudai nishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0125 / JP | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00915417.0 | 07.04.2000 | [2001/18] | WO2000JP02276 | Priority number, date | JP19990103239 | 09.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10323999 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0061663 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095095 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095095 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B65D65/02, // C08L23:08 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08J2323/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/02, C08F220/06, C08F220/1804, C08F2500/26, C08F2500/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FOLIE ZUM UMHÜLLEN | [2001/18] | English: | FILM FOR WRAPPING | [2001/18] | French: | FILM D'EMBALLAGE | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 16.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06322192 ; | [A]JPH083386 ; | [X]WO9116376 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * claims 1,3,4,6-8 * * example - *; | [A]EP0521426 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP0664317 (DU PONT INT [CH]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2,11 ** page 2, line 38 - line 45 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 06, Database accession no. 1995-041430, XP002141885 & JPH06322192 A 19941122 (SHINETSU POLYMER KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 10, Database accession no. 1996-094359, XP002141886 & JPH083386 A 19960109 (MITSUI DU PONT POLYCHEMICAL KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |