EP1088354 - HYDROGEN STORAGE ALLOY ELECTRODE, BATTERY INCLUDING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE BOTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIWAKI, Yoshio 2-13-14, Minamifunahashi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1123 / JP | 02 /
KURANAKA, Sou Room B-201, 18-5, Tsujido 3-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0047 / JP | 03 /
IWASAKI, Mizuo 4-15, Matsuzuka Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0043 / JP | 04 /
YAMASAKI, Yasuhiko 46-4-308, Yamadaikehigashimachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0165 / JP | 05 /
MAEDA, Akihiro Room 101, 2-1-20, Tsujidomotomachi Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0043 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00915478.2 | 10.04.2000 | [2001/14] | WO2000JP02343 | Priority number, date | JP19990106592 | 14.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10659299 | JP20000052670 | 29.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000052670 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0062359 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088354 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088354 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/24, H01M4/62, C01B3/00, H01M4/30 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H01M4/26 (EP,US);
C01B3/0057 (EP,US);
C01B3/0078 (EP,US);
H01M4/0435 (EP,US);
H01M4/242 (EP,US);
H01M4/30 (EP,US);
H01M4/624 (EP,US);
H01M4/626 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE AUS WASSERSTOFFSPEICHERLEGIERUNG, DIESE ENTHALTENDE BATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BEIDER | [2001/14] | English: | HYDROGEN STORAGE ALLOY ELECTRODE, BATTERY INCLUDING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE BOTH | [2001/14] | French: | ELECTRODE EN ALLIAGE DE STOCKAGE D'HYDROGENE, BATTERIE COMPRENANT CELLE-CI ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXA]JPH09245797 ; | [PDA]US5905004 (SAKAI TETSUO [JP], et al) [PDA] * column 1, line 39 - line 62 * * column 3, line 6 - line 10 * * column 3, line 55 - line 67 * * column 5, line 11 - line 24 * * column 5, line 47 - line 55 * * column 8, line 9 - line 40 *; | [DX]JPH07307154 ; | [XA]EP0867248 (KATAYAMA TOKUSHU KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,6-8,12,17 * column 5, line 7 - line 14 * * column 7, line 17 - line 32 * * column 10, line 25 - column 11, line 24 * * column 22, line 28 - column 23, line 44 * * column 24, line 17 - line 35 * * column 24, line 54 - line 57 * [A] 9-11,14; | [A]JPH0992271 | [DXA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09245797 A 19970919 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE &TECHNOL; FUKUDA METAL FOIL & POWDER CO) [DX] 1,2,6,7,12,17 * abstract * [A] 9,14 | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07307154 A 19951121 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE & TECHNOL;OTHERS: 01) [DX] 1,2,12,17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09092271 A 19970404 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |