EP1214151 - CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR WITH LOCKING RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/25] | LOCKING RING FOR A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR | ||
[2009/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB Hans Stahles Väg 147 80 Tumba / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB Hans Stables Väg 147 80 Tumba / SE | ||
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Alfa Laval AB Hans Stahles väg 147 80 Tumba / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDIN, Sven S:t Eriksvägen 5 S-141 32 Huddinge / SE | 02 /
KLINTENSTEDT, Kjell Sjöängsvägen 16 S-132 34 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | 03 /
SALMI, Toini Pl 3901 S-148 97 Sorunda / SE | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00915666.2 | 08.03.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000SE00455 | Priority number, date | SE19990000861 | 09.03.1999 Original published format: SE 9900861 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053327 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214151 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214151 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B04B7/08 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
B04B1/14 (EP,US);
B04B7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2009/23] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | TRENNSCHLEUDER MIT KLEMMRING | [2009/01] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR WITH LOCKING RING | [2009/01] | French: | SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE AVEC ANNEAU DE BLOCAGE | [2009/01] |
Former [2002/25] | KLEMMRING FÜR EINE TRENNSCHLEUDER | ||
Former [2002/25] | LOCKING RING FOR A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR | ||
Former [2002/25] | ANNEAU DE BLOCAGE POUR SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.2009 | BE | 03.06.2009 | CY | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | NL | 03.06.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | ES | 14.09.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | [2012/37] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
BE | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2668658 (PELTZER SR ALBERT); | [A]US4710160 (KLINTENSTEDT KJELL [SE], et al); | [A]SE505311 (KYFFHAEUSERHUETTE MASCHF [DE]) |