EP1185375 - A DRIVE UNIT FOR A CENTRIFUGE ROTOR OF A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA LAVAL AB 147 80 Tumba / SE | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINTENSTEDT, Kjell Sjöängsvägen 16 S-132 34 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | 02 /
LARSEN, Torbjörn Kyrkvärdsplan 8, 1 tr S-147 62 Uttran / SE | 03 /
SETTERBERG, Jan Hällebergsvägen 26 S-141 41 Huddinge / SE | 04 /
SZEPESSY, Stefan Repslagargatan 18 S-118 46 Stockholm / SE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Berglund, Stefan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366 102 49 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Berglund, Stefan, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00915669.6 | 08.03.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000SE00460 | Priority number, date | SE19990000817 | 08.03.1999 Original published format: SE 9900817 | [2002/11] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053332 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185375 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185375 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B04B15/02, B04B9/12 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
B04B9/12 (EP,US);
F16C33/6662 (EP,US);
F16C2320/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Title | German: | Antriebseinheit für den Rotor einer Zentrifugal-Trennvorrichtung | [2002/11] | English: | A DRIVE UNIT FOR A CENTRIFUGE ROTOR OF A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR | [2002/11] | French: | MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR UN ROTOR DE CENTRIFUGATION D'UN SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2000 | Translation filed | 15.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.06.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | BE | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | IT | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | IE | 08.03.2011 | LU | 08.03.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/08] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
IE | 08.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
SE | 23.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4541736 (GIEBELER JR ROBERT H [US]); | [A]EP0756897 (VERONESI SEPARATORI S P A [IT]) | by applicant | US4541736 |