EP1165745 - Apparatus and method for measuring cell activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/01] | CELL ACTIVITY ASSAY APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING SAME | ||
[2005/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEURO PROBE INCORPORATED 16008 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US | [2006/40] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states GOODWIN, Richard, H., Jr. 5311 Briley Place Bethesda, MD 20816 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodwin, Richard H. 5311 Briley Place Bethesda, Maryland 20816 / US | [2006/40] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Tönhardt, Marion, Dr. Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00916095.3 | 06.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US05760 | Priority number, date | US19990271765 | 18.03.1999 Original published format: US 271765 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055298 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165745 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165745 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/12, C12M1/34, C12M3/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/02 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C12M41/36 (EP,US);
C12M41/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Nachweis der Zellaktivität | [2005/40] | English: | Apparatus and method for measuring cell activity | [2005/40] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'analyse de l'activité cellulaire | [2005/40] |
Former [2002/01] | VORRICHTUNG FüR NACHWEISVERFAHREN DER ZELLAKTIVITäT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2002/01] | CELL ACTIVITY ASSAY APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING SAME | ||
Former [2002/01] | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE DE L'ACTIVITE CELLULAIRE ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2006 | BE | 24.05.2006 | CH | 24.05.2006 | CY | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | FR | 24.05.2006 | LI | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CY | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
FR | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
FR | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 24.08.2006 | |
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5210021 (GOODWIN JR RICHARD H [US]); | [A]US5601997 (TCHAO RUY [US]); | [A]US5614719 (HAYES ALAN J [GB], et al) |