EP1163528 - PREDICTION OF DIABETES IMPAIRED WOUND HEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boykin, Joseph V., Jr. 12600 Nightingale Drive Chester, VA 23831-2649 / US | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00916443.5 | 17.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000US07028 | Priority number, date | US19990125284P | 19.03.1999 Original published format: US 125284 P | US20000516584 | 01.03.2000 Original published format: US 516584 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0057190 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1163528 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163528 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/84, G01N33/68 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/84 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
G01N2333/795 (EP,US);
G01N2333/90245 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORHERSAGEN UEBER VON DIABETES BEEINTRAECHTIGTE WUNDHEILUNG | [2001/51] | English: | PREDICTION OF DIABETES IMPAIRED WOUND HEALING | [2001/51] | French: | PREDICTION DE L'ALTERATION DE LA CICATRISATION DE LESIONS CHEZ LE DIABETIQUE PAR ANALYSE DE NITRATE URINAIRE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2002 | 31.03.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2005 | BE | 23.11.2005 | CH | 23.11.2005 | CY | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | LI | 23.11.2005 | NL | 23.11.2005 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | IE | 17.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/45] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
IE | 17.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
IE | 17.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
IE | 17.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
BE | 23.11.2005 | ||
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 23.11.2005 | |
CH | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
LI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DXA] - SCHAEFFER MICHAEL R; TANTRY UDAYA; EFRON PHILIP A; AHRENDT GRETCHEN M; THORNTON FRANCIS J; BARBUL ADRIAN, "Diabetes-impaired healing and reduced wound nitric oxide synthesis: A possible pathophysiologic correlation", SURGERY, St Louis, (1997), vol. 121, pages 513 - 519, XP000952099 [DX] 40-43 * the whole document * [A] 1-39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-6060(97)90105-7 | [XA] - BULGRIN JEFFREY P; SHABANI MOHAMMAD; SMITH DANIEL J, "Arginine-free diet suppresses nitric oxide production in wounds", JOURNAL OF NUTRITIONAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 588 - 593, XP000882118 [X] 40-43 * the whole document * [A] 1-39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0955-2863(93)90027-T | [DXA] - HUSZKA MARIANNA; KAPLAR MIKLOS; REJTO LASZLO; TORNAI ISTVAN; PALATKA KAROLY; LASZLO PAL; UDVARDY MIKLOS, "The association of reduced endothelium derived relaxing factor-NO production with endothelial damage and increased in vivo platelet activation in patients with diabetes mellitus", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 86, pages 173 - 180, XP000952106 [DX] 40-43 * page 174, paragraph 5 - page 175, paragraph 2 * [A] 1-39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0049-3848(97)00060-1 | [DX] - MISKO THOMAS P; SCHILLING ROGER J; SALVEMINI DANIELA; MOORE WILLIAM M; CURRIE MARK G, "A fluorometric assay for the measurement of nitrite in biological samples", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 214, pages 11 - 16, XP002149443 [DX] 40-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1993.1449 | [DX] - GILLIAM MARY B; SHERMAN MICHAEL P; GRISCAVAGE JEANETTE M; IGNARRO LOUIS J, "A spectrophotometric assay for nitrate using NADPH oxidation by Aspergillus nitrate reductase", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 212, pages 359 - 365, XP002149444 [DX] 40-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1993.1341 | [PXA] - JUDE E B; BOULTON A J M; FERGUSON M W J; APPLETON I, "The role of nitric oxide synthase isoforms and arginase in the pathogenesis of diabetic foot ulcers: Possible modulatory effects by transforming growth factor beta 1", DIABETOLOGIA, (199906), vol. 42, pages 748 - 757, XP000952104 [PX] 40-43 * page 749, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 750, column 1, paragraph 4 * [PA] 1-39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001250051224 | Examination | - KIECHLE F.L., ANNALS OF CLINICAL AND LABORATORY SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 501 - 511 | - VASQUEZ-VIVAR J. ET AL, BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 314, pages 869 - 876 | - SCHWEDHELM E. ET AL, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 276, pages 195 - 203 | - OHSHIMA H. ET AL, NITRIC OXIDE, (1999), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 132 - 141 | - MEYER J. ET AL, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 247, pages 11 - 16 | - BARKER S.L. ET AL, ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 71, pages 2071 - 2075 | - TER STEEGE J.C.A. ET AL, FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, vol. 25, no. 8, pages 953 - 963 |