EP1175246 - UPREGULATION OF TYPE III ENDOTHELIAL CELL NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE BY HMG-CoA REDUCTASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC. 75 Francis Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2004/30] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC. 75 Francis Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAO, James, K. 12 Audubon Road Weston, MA 02193 / US | 02 /
LAUFS, Ulrich Warburgring 37 66424 Homburg / DE | 03 /
ENDRES, Matthias Gleimstrasse 60 D-10437 Berlin / DE | 04 /
MOSKOWITZ, Michael, A. 257 Prospect Street Belmont, MA 02178 / US | [2002/22] |
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
LIAO, James, K. 12 Audubon Road Weston, MA 02193 / US | ||
02 /
LAUFS, Ulrich Kyllburgerstrasse 5 D-50937 Koeln / DE | |||
03 /
ENDRES, Matthias Gleimstrasse 60 D-10437 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
MOSKOWITZ, Michael, A. 257 Prospect Street Belmont, MA 02178 / US | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Jump, Timothy John Simon Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2002/05] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00916511.9 | 17.03.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000US07221 | Priority number, date | US19990273445 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: US 273445 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056403 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175246 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61P9/10 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/7048 (EP);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/365 (EP);
A61K31/366 (EP);
A61K31/505 (EP);
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/365, A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/505, A61K31/365 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEIGERUNG DER TYPE III ENDOTHELIALZELL-STICKSTOFFOXID-SYNTHASE DURCH HMG-COA-REDUKTASE HEMMER | [2002/05] | English: | UPREGULATION OF TYPE III ENDOTHELIAL CELL NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE BY HMG-CoA REDUCTASE INHIBITORS | [2002/05] | French: | REGULATION POSITIVE DE L'OXYDE NITRIQUE SYNTHASE DES CELLULES ENDOTHELIALES DE TYPE III PAR DES INHIBITEURS DE LA HMG-COA REDUCTASE | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 03.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0671171 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 1-22,26,27,34-37 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 10 *; | [XP]WO9918952 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [XP] 1-43 * page 7, line 30 - page 18, line 25 * | [X] - LAUFS ET AL, "inhibition of HMG-CoA reductase blocks hypoxia-mediated down-regulation of endothelial nitric oxide synthase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19971212), vol. 272, no. 50, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 31725 - 31729, XP002091893 [X] 1-22,26,27,34-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.50.31725 | [X] - ENDRES ET AL, "stroke protection by HMG-CoA reductase inhibitors mediated by endothelial nitric oxide synthase", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19980701), vol. 95, no. 15, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8880 - 8885, XP002091890 [X] 1-22,26,27,34-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.15.8880 | [A] - BOEGER RAINER H ET AL, "Dietary L-arginine reduces the progression of atherosclerosis in cholesterol-fed rabbits: Comparison with lovastatin", CIRCULATION, (1997), vol. 96, no. 4, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 1282 - 1290, XP002302014 | International search | [Y]US4444784 (HOFFMAN WILLIAM F [US], et al) |