EP1163714 - SPRING MOUNTING FOR AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Power Generation, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando FL 32826-2399 / US | [2005/46] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Siemens Westinghouse Power Corporation 4400 Alafaya Trail, MC 111 Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARBONELL, Luis, Enrique 925 Centennial Avenue Deltona, FL 32765 / US | 02 /
SARGEANT, John, Barry 409 West High Street Oviedo, FL 32765 / US | 03 /
MONTGOMERY, Lon, W. 4990 Courtland Loop Winter Springs, FL 32708 / US | 04 /
FULLER, Robert, Allen 10526 Cresto Del Sol Circle Orlando, FL 32817 / US | 05 /
GREEN, Derek, Wayne 14043 Hatton Cross Drive Charlotte, NC 28278 / US | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/51] | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens Shared Services Limited, Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00916540.8 | 20.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000US07323 | Priority number, date | US19990274260 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 274260 | US19990298260 | 22.04.1999 Original published format: US 298260 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0057535 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163714 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163714 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/18, F16F1/18, H02K5/24, H02K5/14 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
G07F17/0078 (EP,US);
F16F1/185 (EP,US);
H02K1/185 (EP,US);
H02K5/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELASTISCHES LAGER FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN GENERATOR | [2001/51] | English: | SPRING MOUNTING FOR AN ELECTRIC GENERATOR | [2001/51] | French: | SUSPENSION A RESSORT POUR GENERATEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 26.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 11.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4891540 (COOPER GLENN D [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column A * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, line 27 - column 55, line 9; figures 1-5 *; | [X]JPS60125137 ; | [X]US3531667 (BARTON STERLING C, et al) [X] 1,3,5 * column 1, lines 14-23 * * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4469973 (GUYOT JEAN [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * the whole document,especially: col. 5, lines 31-45, figure 7 *; | [A]US4519591 (BUSH JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 2,4-8 * column A * * column 3, lines 3-64; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4546958 (OHNO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 2,4,5 * column A * * column 1, lines 51-60 * * column 2, lines 22-49; figures 1-5,14 *; | [A]US4425523 (DETINKO FELIX M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A * * column 3, line 58 - column 5, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4145626 (AROSHIDZE JURY V, et al) [A] 1 * column W * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851111), vol. 9, no. 284, Database accession no. (E - 357), & JP60125137 A 19850706 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,3 * abstract * |