EP1171667 - INSULATED FOUNDATION AND FLOOR, AND METHOD AND MEANS FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graugaard, Kai Susavej 25 7400 Heming / DK | [2002/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Holme, Edvard, et al Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Holme, Edvard, et al Holme Patent A/S, Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V. / DK | Application number, filing date | 00916822.0 | 12.04.2000 | [2002/03] | WO2000DK00174 | Priority number, date | DK19990000160 | 13.04.1999 Original published format: DK 16099 | DK275900009 | 22.02.2000 Original published format: DK 275900009 | [2002/03] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0061879 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1171667 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E02D27/01 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
E02D27/02 (EP);
E04B2005/322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERTES FUNDAMENT UND ISOLIERTER BODEN UND VERFAHREN UND MITTEL FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [2002/03] | English: | INSULATED FOUNDATION AND FLOOR, AND METHOD AND MEANS FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2002/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET MOYENS DE FABRICATION DE FONDATIONS ET D'UN PLANCHER ISOLES | [2002/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2000 | Translation filed | 13.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SE505361 ; | [X]SE507845 ; | [XP]SE9802253 ; | [X]SE9500351 ; | [X]SE444335 |