EP1161538 - METHOD FOR INDUCING VIRAL RESISTANCE INTO A PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONARD, Gérard 12, rue du Général Zimmer F-67084 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | 02 /
LAUBER, Emmanuelle 34, rue de Rotterdam F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
GUILLEY, Hubert 32, rue de l'Herbe F-67370 Berstett / FR | 04 /
RICHARDS, Kenneth 2a, rue Principale F-67570 Pfulgriesheim / FR | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 00916929.3 | 07.03.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000EP02176 | Priority number, date | EP19990200773 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: EP 99200773 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0055301 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1161538 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/40, C12N15/82, A01H5/00 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N15/8283 (EP);
C12N2770/00022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 31.08.2001 | LV | 31.08.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 31.08.2001 | SI | 31.08.2001 | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR INDUKTION VIRALER RESISTENZ IN EINER PFLANZE | [2001/50] | English: | METHOD FOR INDUCING VIRAL RESISTANCE INTO A PLANT | [2001/50] | French: | PROCEDE POUR CONFERER UNE RESISTANCE VIRALE A UNE PLANTE | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/26] | 10.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9807875 (SES EUROPE NV SA [BE], et al) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [YD] - BECK D L ET AL, "DISRUPTION OF VIRUS MOVEMENT CONFERS BROAD-SPECTRUM RESISTANCE AGAINST SYSTEMIC INFECTION BY PLANT VIRUSES WITH A TRIPLE GENE BLOCK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (1994), vol. 91, ISSN 0027-8424, page 10310-10314, XP000617721 [YD] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.22.10310 | [A] - LAUBER E ET AL, "Cell-to-cell movement of beet necrotic yellow vein virus: I. Heterologous complementation experiments provide evidence for specific interactions among the triple gene block proteins.", MOLECULAR PLANT-MICROBE INTERACTIONS, (1998 JUL) 11 (7) 618-25., (1998), XP000869913 [A] 1-22 * see the whole document; esp. p.623 r. col. * | [A] - BLEYKASTENGROSSHANS C ET AL, "Independent expression of the first two triple gene block proteins of beet necrotic yellow vein virus complements virus defective in the corresponding gene but expression of the third protein inhibits viral cell-to-cell movement", MOLECULAR PLANT-MICROBE INTERACTIONS, (MAR 1997) VOL. 10, NO. 2, PP. 240-246. PUBLISHER: AMER PHYTOPATHOLOGICAL SOC, 3340 PILOT KNOB ROAD, ST PAUL, MN 55121. ISSN: 0894-0282., (1997), XP000869623 [A] 1-22 * see the whole document; esp. p.245 l. col. * | [A] - LAUBER, E. ET AL, "Strategies for producing pathogen-derived resistance to rhizomania in transgenic sugarbeets", 61E CONGRES INSTITUT INTERNATIONAL DE RECHERCHES BETTERAVIERES, BRUXELLES BELGIUM, 11-12 FEBRUARY 1998, (1998) PP. 205-220. 40 REF. PUBLISHER: INSTITUT INTERNATIONAL DE RECHERCHES BETTERAVIERES. BRUSSELS MEETING INFO.: 61E CONGRES INSTITUT INTERNATIO, XP002128240 [A] 1-22 * abstract * | [AD] - SEPPAENEN P ET AL, "MOVEMENT PROTEIN-DERIVED RESISTANCE TO TRIPLE GENE BLOCK-CONTAINING PLANT VIRUSES", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY,GB,SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, READING, (1997), vol. 78, no. PART 06, ISSN 0022-1317, page 1241-1246, XP002073446 [AD] 1-22 * the whole document * | [AD] - GILMER D ET AL, "EFFICIENT CELL-TO-CELL MOVEMENT OF BEET NECROTIC YELLOW VEIN VIRUS REQUIRES 3' PROXIMAL GENES LOCATED ON RNA 2", VIROLOGY,US,ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, (1992), vol. 189, ISSN 0042-6822, page 40-47, XP000617724 [AD] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90679-J |