EP1089569 - IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE AND ITS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRANAKA, Daisuke Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00917344.4 | 18.04.2000 | [2001/14] | WO2000JP02525 | Priority number, date | JP19990110962 | 19.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11096299 | [2001/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064187 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089569 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/30, H04N7/32 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H04N19/577 (EP);
H04N19/115 (EP);
H04N19/124 (EP);
H04N19/132 (EP);
H04N19/149 (EP);
H04N19/15 (EP);
H04N19/152 (EP);
H04N19/159 (EP);
H04N19/172 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDKODIERUNG | [2001/14] | English: | IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE AND ITS METHOD | [2001/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'IMAGE ET PROCEDE CONNEXE | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2000 | Translation filed | 18.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 15.01.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07203456 ; | [Y]JPH10336670 ; | [A]EP0713341 ; | [A]JPH1198514 |