EP1174722 - ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE GENERATING SOURCE PROBING DEVICE, METHOD THEREFOR AND ANALYZING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UESAKA, Kouichi, Production Engineering Res. Lab. Hitachi, Ltd., 292, Yoshida-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP | 02 /
SHINBO, Kenichi, Production Engineering Res. Lab. Hitachi, Ltd., 292, Yoshida-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/04] | Application number, filing date | 00917414.5 | 21.04.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000JP02623 | Priority number, date | JP19990117028 | 23.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11702899 | [2002/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0065362 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174722 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01R29/08, G01B7/00, G01S5/12 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
G01R29/0814 (EP,US);
G01R29/0821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SONDE FüR ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE WELLENQUELLEN, VERFAHREN DAFüR UND ANALYSIERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFüR | [2002/04] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE GENERATING SOURCE PROBING DEVICE, METHOD THEREFOR AND ANALYZING METHOD THEREFOR | [2002/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SONDAGE POUR LA RECHERCHE DE SOURCE D'ONDES ELECTROMAGNETIQUES, ET PROCEDE D'ANALYSE ASSOCIE | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2001 | Translation filed | 22.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 16.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5300879 (MASUDA NORIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 7 - line 11 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 2 * * column 6, line 16 - line 19 * * column 6, line 62 - line 66 * * column 9, line 5 - line 15 * * column 9, line 50 - line 60 *; | [A]EP0239251 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 16 *; | [YD]JPH04329376 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [YD] 1-11 * abstract *; | [XP]EP0950900 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-11 * abstract * | International search | [XP]JPH11133080 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JPH05281274 ; | [Y]US4713768 (KOSAKA MICHITAKA [JP], et al); | [A]JPH07181209 (SHARP KK) |