EP1138428 - TUBULAR ELECTRODE HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sodick Co., Ltd. 12-1, Nakamachidai 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8522 / JP | [2008/14] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Sodick Co., Ltd. 12-1, Nakamachidai 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Shigeru Sodick Co., Ltd., 78 Nagaya, Sakai-cho Sakai-gun, Fukui 919-0598 / JP | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00917426.9 | 21.04.2000 | [2001/40] | WO2000JP02649 | Priority number, date | JP19990113151 | 21.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11315199 | [2001/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064617 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1138428 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138428 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23H1/00, B23H7/26 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
B23H7/265 (EP,US);
B23H9/14 (EP,US);
B23H2400/10 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17111 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENHALTERUNG FÜR ROHRFÖRMIGE ELEKTRODE | [2001/40] | English: | TUBULAR ELECTRODE HOLDER | [2001/40] | French: | PORTE-ELECTRODE TUBULAIRE | [2001/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2000 | Translation filed | 17.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 05.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29715782U (ABACUS AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 8, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [DA]JPH08290332 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08290332 A 19961105 (ERENITSUKUSU:KK) [DA] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [XP]JP2000094219 (SODICK CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH0360930 (ZEDOMU KK); | [A]JPH0441129 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |