EP1177512 - METHOD FOR EXTRACTING INFORMATION FROM A DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qliktech International AB Forskningsbyn Ideon 223 70 Lund / SE | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolgé, Håkan Viborgsslingan 18 S-224 72 Lund / SE | [2012/01] |
Former [2002/06] | 01 /
WOLG, H kan Viborgsslingan 18 S-224 72 Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Persson, Albin, et al Hansson Thyresson AB Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Persson, Albin, et al Hansson Thyresson Patentbyra AB Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2002/06] | Andersson, Björn E., et al Awapatent AB, Bellevuevägen 46, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 00917562.1 | 10.03.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000SE00482 | Priority number, date | SE19990000894 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: SE 9900894 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055766 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177512 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
G06F16/284 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2012/01] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTNEHMEN VON INFORMATIONEN AUS EINER DATEI | [2002/06] | English: | METHOD FOR EXTRACTING INFORMATION FROM A DATABASE | [2002/06] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION D'INFORMATIONS D'UNE BASE DE DONNEES | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/13] | 21.01.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/13] | Appeal following examination | 20.03.2013 | Appeal received No. T1312/13 | 21.05.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.12.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 06.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP11189938.1 / EP2450809 | EP11189942.3 / EP2450810 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 09.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 08.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5423035 (DEPREZ DANIEL [US]); | [A]US5517641 (BARRY RICHARD E [US], et al); | [A]US5842209 (MOCEK DARRYL JON [US], et al); | [AP]US5960428 (LINDSAY BRUCE GILBERT [US], et al) | Examination | - LEO GOTLIEB, "Computing joins of relations", SIGMOD '75 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1975 ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA, NEW YORK, USA, doi:10.1145/500080.500089, (19750101), pages 55 - 63, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/510000/500089/P055.pdf?ip=145.64.134.242&acc=ACTIVE SERVICE&CFID=135067047&CFTOKEN=29343652&__acm__=1343918833_4846cbbe2cbfa623c808736d5b7b7393, (20120802), XP055034569 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/500080.500089 | - GRAEFE G, "Query evaluation techniques for large databases", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19930601), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1145/152610.152611, ISSN 0360-0300, pages 73 - 170, XP002306867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/152610.152611 |