EP1175427 - LINKERS FOR SYNTHESIS OF OLIGOSACCHARIDES ON SOLID SUPPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEBERGER, Peter, H. 100 Memorial Drive, 2-19A Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
ANDRADE, Rodrigo, P. 16 Broadway, Apt. 8 Somervile, MA 02145 / US | [2002/17] |
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
SEEBERGER, Peter, H. 100 Memorial Drive, 2-19A Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
02 /
ANDRADE, Rodrigo, P. 30 Hunting Street 2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/05] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00917725.4 | 03.03.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000US05659 | Priority number, date | US19990122930P | 05.03.1999 Original published format: US 122930 P | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0052018 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175427 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175427 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/00, C07H3/00, C08B37/00, C07B61/00 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
C40B40/12 (EP,US);
C07H1/00 (EP,US);
C07H15/18 (EP,US);
C07H3/06 (EP,US);
C40B50/18 (EP,US);
C40B80/00 (EP,US);
C07B2200/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Title | German: | LINKER ZUR SYNTHESE VON OLIGOSACCHARIDEN AUF FESTTRÄGERN | [2002/05] | English: | LINKERS FOR SYNTHESIS OF OLIGOSACCHARIDES ON SOLID SUPPORTS | [2002/05] | French: | LIEURS UTILISES DANS LA SYNTHESE D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES SUR SUPPORTS SOLIDES | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | IT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | IE | 03.03.2011 | LU | 03.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19621177 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,25,39,53 * example -; claim - *; | [X] - D. RAEDERSTORFF, "Biosynthetic studies of marine lipids. 11. Synthesis, biosynthesis, and absolute configuration ofinternally branched demospongic acid, 22-methyl-5,9-octacosadienic acid", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (1987), vol. 52, no. 12, pages 2337 - 2346, XP002164657 [X] 1-16,18,25-30,32 * pages 2342, scheme VI and page 2345, column 2, compounds 31 and 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00388a001 | [X] - U. JAHN, "Towards a tandem-radical macrocyclization-transannular cyclization approach to steroids: transanular cyclizations of a macrocyclic core", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (1995), vol. 36, no. 49, pages 8921 - 8924, XP004026773 [X] 1-16,18,25-30,32 * page 8924, compound 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)01918-8 | [X] - K. MIURA, "Highly stereoselective intramolecular addition of a hydroxyl group to vinylsilanes via 1,2-silyl migration", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, (1997), vol. 62, no. 24, pages 8292 - 8293, XP002164658 [X] 1-16,18,25-30,32 * table 1, entries 9 and 10, compounds 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo971847p | [X] - N. HAYASHI, "The biomimetic construction of fused cyclic polyethers", TETRAHEDRON, (INCL TETRAHEDRON REPORTS), OXFORD GB, (1997), vol. 53, no. 37, pages 12425 - 12468, XP004106162 [X] 1-16,18,25-30,32 * pages 12450-12452, compounds 16, 29 and 31 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(97)00780-1 | [PXD] - R. B. ANDRADE, "Solid-phase oligosaccharide synthesis: preparation of complex structures using a novel linker and different glycosylating agents", ORGANIC LETTERS, (1999), vol. 1, no. 11, pages 1811 - 1814, XP000914375 [PXD] 1-38,53-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol991071+ |