EP1169312 - GLUCOKINASE ACTIVATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIZZARRO, Fred, Thomas 85 Sterling Drive Colonia, NJ 07067 / US | 02 /
CORBETT, Wendy, Lea 36 Ridgewood Drive Randolph, NJ 07869-3754 / US | 03 /
FOCELLA, Antonino 61 Warner Way Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | 04 /
GRIPPO, Joseph, Francis 324 Somerset Street 7 Stirling, NJ 07980 / US | 05 /
HAYNES, Nancy-Ellen 508 Linden Place Cranford, NJ 07016 / US | 06 /
HOLLAND, George, William 10 Acorn Place North Caldwell, NJ 07006 / US | 07 /
KESTER, Robert, Francis 162 Forest Hill Road West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | 08 /
MAHANEY, Paige, E. Apartment 1A, 828 Bloomfield Avenue Montclair, NJ 07042 / US | 09 /
SARABU, Ramakanth 3 Candlewick Drive Towaco, NJ 07082 / US | [2002/18] |
Former [2002/08] | 01 /
BIZZARRO, Fred, Thomas 85 Sterling Drive Colonia, NJ 07067 / US | ||
02 /
CORBETT, Wendy, Lea 36 Ridgewood Drive Randolph, NJ 07869-3754 / US | |||
03 /
FOCELLA, Antonino 61 Warner Way Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | |||
04 /
GRIPPO, Joseph, Francis 324 Somerset Street 7 Stirling, NJ 07980 / US | |||
05 /
HAYNES, Nancy-Ellen 508 Linden Place Cranford, NJ 07016 / US | |||
06 /
HOLLAND, George, William 10 Acorn Place North Caldwell, NJ 07006 / US | |||
07 /
KESTER, Robert, Francis Apartment 438, 240 Prospect Avenue Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US | |||
08 /
MAHANEY, Paige, E. Apartment 1A, 828 Bloomfield Avenue Montclair, NJ 07042 / US | |||
09 /
SARABU, Ramakanth 3 Candlewick Drive Towaco, NJ 07082 / US | |||
Former [2002/02] | 01 /
BIZZARRO, Fred, Thomas 85 Sterling Drive Colonia, NJ 07067 / US | ||
02 /
CORBETT, Wendy, Lea 36 Ridgewood Drive Randolph, NJ 07869-3754 / US | |||
03 /
FOCELLA, Antonino 61 Warner Way Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | |||
04 /
GRIPPO, Joseph, Francis 324 Somerset Street 7 Stirling, NJ 07980 / US | |||
05 /
HAYNES, Nancy-Ellen 508 Linden Place Cranford, NJ 07016 / US | |||
06 /
HOLLAND, George, William 10 Acorn Place North Caldwell, NJ 07006 / US | |||
07 /
KESTER, Robert, Francis Apartment 438, 240 Prospect Avenue Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US | |||
08 /
MAHANEY, Paige, E. Apartment 1A, 828 Bloomfield Avenue Montclair, NJ 07042 / US | |||
09 /
SARABU, Ramakanth 73 Forest Road Cedar Grove, NJ 07009 / US | Representative(s) | Witte, Hubert F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP) 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Witte, Hubert, Dr. F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 00918816.0 | 20.03.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000EP02450 | Priority number, date | US19990126707P | 29.03.1999 Original published format: US 126707 P | US19990165948P | 17.11.1999 Original published format: US 165948 P | US19990165944P | 17.11.1999 Original published format: US 165944 P | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0058293 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1169312 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1169312 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/46, A61K31/426, C07D277/56, C07D213/75, A61K31/42, A61P3/10 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
C07D213/75 (EP);
C07D277/56 (EP,KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C275/50 (EP);
C07C317/44 (EP);
C07C323/62 (EP);
C07D213/80 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP);
C07D233/88 (EP);
C07D237/22 (EP);
C07D239/42 (EP);
C07D253/07 (EP);
C07D261/14 (EP);
C07D263/48 (EP);
C07D277/46 (EP);
C07D277/58 (EP);
C07D285/135 (EP);
C07C2601/02 (EP);
C07C2601/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 29.10.2001 | LV | 29.10.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 29.10.2001 | SI | 29.10.2001 | Title | German: | GLUKOKINASE AKTIVATOREN | [2002/02] | English: | GLUCOKINASE ACTIVATORS | [2002/02] | French: | ACTIVATEURS DE GLUCOKINASE | [2002/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE249241 (BAYER) [X] 1,5 * see example 1; page 1, column R, line 46 - line 50; claim 1 *; | [A]US3776917 (MANN T, et al) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 23 - line 60 ** column 6, line 31 - line 57 *; | [X] - SPIELMAN M. A. ET AL., "Anticonvulsant Drugs. II. Some Acylureas", JOURNAL OF AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1948), vol. 70, pages 4189 - 4191, XP000940775 [X] 1,5 * page 4190; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01192a063 |