EP1163707 - MODULAR HSSDC PLUG CONNECTOR AND IMPROVED RECEPTACLE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMPHENOL CORPORATION 358 Hall Avenue, P.O. Box 5030 Wallingford, CT 06492-0384 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states AMPHENOL CORPORATION 358 Hall Avenue, P.O. Box 5030 Wallingford, CT 06492-0384 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUTROS, Kamal, Shawicky 80 Leisure Lane Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 4X1 / CA | 02 /
PIKE, Robert 54 Eastport Drive Scarborough, Ontario M1C 5C4 / CA | 03 /
DIMA, Martian, Daniel 60 Painted Rock Avenue Richmond Hill, Ontario L4S 1P6 / CA | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/51] | Fry, Alan Valentine, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 00919261.8 | 17.02.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000US02516 | Priority number, date | US19990255004 | 22.02.1999 Original published format: US 255004 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0051206 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163707 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/00, H01R13/66, H01R13/719 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
H01R13/719 (EP,US);
H01R13/6658 (EP,US);
H01R12/716 (EP,US);
H01R12/724 (EP,US);
H01R13/506 (EP,US);
H01R13/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/20] | H01R12/00, H01R13/66 | ||
Former IPC [2001/51] | H01R12/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | MODULARER HSSDC-STECKVERBINDER UND VERBESSERTE BUCHSE DAFÜR | [2001/51] | English: | MODULAR HSSDC PLUG CONNECTOR AND IMPROVED RECEPTACLE THEREFOR | [2001/51] | French: | CONNECTEUR ENFICHABLE MODULAIRE A LA NORME HSSDC, ET PRISE AMELIOREE POUR UN TEL CONNECTEUR | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE29804543U (HSING CHAU IND CO [TW]) [X] 1,9 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 25; figures 1-7 * [Y] 2-5,10,13; | [YA]US5766027 (FOGG MICHAEL W [US]) [Y] 2-5,10,13 * column 4, line 24 - line 36; figures 1-22 * [A] 6-8,11,12; | [A]EP0863581 (BERG ELECTRONICS MFG [NL]) [A] 14 * column 1, line 23 - line 27 *; | [X]WO9908062 (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [X] 15-17 * page 9, line 14 - page 11, line 15; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US4921431 (GARAY ANTONIO A [US], et al) [A] 15-17 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 44; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0653816 (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 15-17 * column 5, line 25 - line 45; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US5397250 (BRIONES FRANCISCO R [CA]) [A] 15 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 9; figure 9 * | International search | [X]US4397513 (CLARK RICHARD P, et al); | [X]US5797771 (GARSIDE R TROY [US]); | [Y]US4629266 (VISELLI MICHAEL A [US]); | [Y]US5397250 (BRIONES FRANCISCO R [CA]) |