EP1183684 - REACTIVE ION BEAM ETCHING METHOD AND A THIN FILM HEAD FABRICATED USING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEECO INSTRUMENTS INC. 1 Terminal Drive Plainview, NY 11803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states VEECO INSTRUMENTS INC. Terminal Drive Plainview, NY 11803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Kurt, E. 146-31 60th Avenue Flushing, NY 11355-5427 / US | 02 /
DRUZ, Boris, L. 1721 E. 14th Street Brooklyn, NY 11229-2024 / US | 03 /
HINES, Danielle, S. 160 Old Roaring Brook Road Mount Kisco, NY 10549-3716 / US | 04 /
LONDONO, John, F. 11 Russel Drive, Apt. E30 Mineola, NY 11501-4776 / US | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00919854.0 | 30.03.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000US08400 | Priority number, date | US19990281663 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: US 281663 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0058953 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1183684 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1183684 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/31, C23F4/00 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
C23F4/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/3163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | 04.10.2001 | LT | 04.10.2001 | LV | 04.10.2001 | MK | 04.10.2001 | RO | 04.10.2001 | SI | 04.10.2001 | Title | German: | REAKTIVIONENSTRAHLÄTZENVERFAHREN UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER DÜNNFILMKOPF | [2002/10] | English: | REACTIVE ION BEAM ETCHING METHOD AND A THIN FILM HEAD FABRICATED USING THE METHOD | [2002/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE GRAVURE IONIQUE REACTIVE ET TETE A COUCHE MINCE FABRIQUEE A L'AIDE DE CE PROCEDE | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Request for further processing for: | 13.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 13.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   08.06.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2008 | BE | 25.06.2008 | CY | 25.06.2008 | DK | 25.06.2008 | FI | 25.06.2008 | IT | 25.06.2008 | NL | 25.06.2008 | SE | 25.09.2008 | GR | 26.09.2008 | ES | 06.10.2008 | PT | 25.11.2008 | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
IT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
GR | 26.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
IT | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
DK | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
BE | 25.06.2008 | ||
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
ES | 06.10.2008 | ||
PT | 25.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | ||
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 25.06.2008 | |
FI | 25.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10112007 ; | [A]JPH10143817 ; | [A]US5198634 (MATTSON BRAD S [US], et al) [A] 1,36,53 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 62 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 68; claim - *; | [XAY]US5281302 (GABRIC ZVONIMIR [DE], et al) [X] 36-39 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 4 - line 32 * [A] 1,12,13,15-17,32,34,35 [Y] 1; | [A]US5438747 (KROUNBI MOHAMAD T [US], et al) [A] 1,7-11 * column 11, line 9 - column 12, line 60 *; | [A]US5607599 (ICHIHARA KATSUTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5770100 (FUKUYAMA RYOOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,36 * column 2, line 7 - line 46 * * column 3, line 40 - line 42 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0871200 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 36-41,53,54,57,58,61,62 * page 2, line 26 - line 46 * * page 6, line 23 - line 28 ** page 5, line 36 - line 43; claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]US5867890 (HSIAO RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1,2,53,57-60 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 31; claim - *; | [YA]US5878481 (FENG YONG-CHANG [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 9 - line 50 * * column 6, line 43 - line 63 * * column 12, line 7 - column 13, line 22; figure 11 * [A] 2; | [PA]US5938941 (ISHIWATA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al); | [PA]US5949625 (SATO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10112007 A 19980428 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,25-27,35,53,54,57-59 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10143817 A 19980529 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,7,8,21,22,25-27,35 * abstract * |