EP1166047 - METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR CORRECTING PERIODIC SIGNALS OF AN INCREMENTAL POSITION MEASURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGSCHAT, Reiner Ammerbacher Strasse 109 D-07745 Jena / DE | 02 /
KRAUSS, Mathias Brombergstrasse 2 D-72119 Ammerbuch / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00920553.5 | 22.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000EP02576 | Priority number, date | DE1999114388 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19914388 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0060314 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1166047 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166047 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/244 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G01D5/24476 (EP,US);
G01D5/2448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/24] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR KORREKTUR VON PERIODISCHEN SIGNALEN EINES INKREMENTALEN POSITIONSMESSSYSTEMS | [2002/01] | English: | METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR CORRECTING PERIODIC SIGNALS OF AN INCREMENTAL POSITION MEASURING SYSTEM | [2002/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET CIRCUIT POUR LA CORRECTION DE SIGNAUX PERIODIQUES D'UN SYSTEME DE MESURE DE POSITION INCREMENTIEL | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 16.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2004
13.03.2004
ADMISSIBLE patentverein.de.e.V. Am Kuemmerling 18 55294 Bodenheim / DE | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.03.2004
patentverein.de.e.V. Am Kuemmerling 18 55294 Bodenheim / DE Opponent's representative Hübner, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Seerig & Hübner Patentanwälte Am Alten Bad 6 09111 Chemnitz / DE | 22.04.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.10.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.10.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.06.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.07.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/49] | 15.07.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 29.09.2005 | Appeal received No. T1279/05 | 25.11.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.07.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 15.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE19712622 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 25 * * column 9, line 35 - line 41 * [A] 15; | [YA]JPH02309280 ; | [A]EP0489936 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910311), vol. 015, no. 099, Database accession no. (P - 1177), & JP02309280 A 19901225 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 15 |