EP1143945 - CARNITINE SUPPLEMENTED DIET TO PREVENT SUDDEN DEATH SYNDROME IN BROILER BREEDER TYPE POULTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza AG Münchensteinerstrasse 38 4052 Basel / CH | For all designated states THE BOARD OF REGENTS OF OKLAHOMA STATE UNIVERSITY 203 Whitehurst, Oklahoma State University Stillwater, OK 74078 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Lonza AG Münchensteinerstrasse 38 4052 Basel / CH | ||
For all designated states THE BOARD OF REGENTS OF OKLAHOMA STATE UNIVERSITY 203 Whitehurst, Oklahoma State University Stillwater, OK 74078 / US | |||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Lonza AG Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH | ||
For all designated states THE BOARD OF REGENTS OF OKLAHOMA STATE UNIVERSITY 203 Whitehurst, Oklahoma State University Stillwater, OK 74078 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEETER, Robert, G. 3818 S. Sangre Rd. Stillwater, OK 74074 / US | 02 /
VANHOOSER, Stanley, L. 3919 E. Lone Chimney Rd. Glencoe, OK 74032 / US | 03 /
OWEN, Kevin, Q. 3325 Effingham Manhatten, KS 66503 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 00920562.6 | 23.03.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000EP02602 | Priority number, date | US19990273651 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: US 273651 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0056294 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143945 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143945 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61P9/00 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/105 (EP,US);
A61K31/205 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/42] | A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARNITIN-FUTTERMITTELZUSATZ ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES PLÖTZLICHEN TODES VON HÄHNCHENZÜCHTUNGSARTIGEM GEFLÜGEL | [2001/42] | English: | CARNITINE SUPPLEMENTED DIET TO PREVENT SUDDEN DEATH SYNDROME IN BROILER BREEDER TYPE POULTRY | [2001/42] | French: | REGIME ALIMENTAIRE ENRICHI PAR ADJONCTION DE CARNITINE POUR PREVENIR LA MORT SUBITE CHEZ LA VOLAILLE A GRILLER | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.05.2003 | FI | 28.05.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | [2016/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 28.05.2003 | |
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1743521 ; | [X]RU1790382 ; | [X]RU2050793 ; | [X]SU1678284 ; | [X]SU1678285 ; | [A]JPH07123928 ; | [A]WO9625859 (LONZA AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19528076 (NEUENDORF WINFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5686491 (SHERWOOD GEOFFREY [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 25, Database accession no. 1993-204144, XP002163192 & SU1743521 A 19920630 (LIVESTOCK PHYSIOLOGY BIOCHEM FEEDING RES) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 12, Database accession no. 1994-098705, XP002163193 & SU1790382 A 19930123 (UNIV MARIISK) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 40, Database accession no. 1996-400318, XP002163194 & RU2050793 C 19951227 (GALOCHKINA V P) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 33, Database accession no. 1992-275029, XP002163195 & SU1678284 A 19910923 (FARM ANIMALS PHYSIOLOGY BIOCHEM) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 33, Database accession no. 1992-275030, XP002163196 & SU1678285 A 19910923 (FARM ANIMALS PHYSIOLOGY BIOCHEM) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 28, Database accession no. 1995-211576, XP002163197 & JPH07123928 A 19950516 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - ROE C R ET AL, "RECOGNITION OF MEDIUM-CHAIN ACYL COENZYME A DEHYDROGENASE DEFICIENCY IN ASYMPTOMATIC SIBLINGS OF CHILDREN DYING OF SUDDEN INFANT DEATH OR REYE-LIKE SYNDROMES", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS, (1986), vol. 108, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3476, pages 13 - 18, XP000989911 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 15, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * | [A] - VIANEY-LIAUD C ET AL, "The inborn errors of mitochondrial fatty acid oxidation.", JOURNAL OF INHERITED METABOLIC DISEASE, (1987) 10 SUPPL 1 159-200. REF: 136, XP000989903 [A] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01812855 | [A] - KUNNERT B, "[ Carnitine deficiency and carnitine therapy]. Karnitinmangel und Karnitintherapie.", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR DIE GESAMTE INNERE MEDIZIN UND IHRE GRENZGEBIETE, (1988 JAN 1) 43 (1) 1-5. REF: 51, XP000989907 [A] 1-11 * abstract * |