EP1166300 - SAFETY SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västerås / SE | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESMALM, Monia Hakantorpsgatan 35 S-724 76 Västeras / SE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Dahlstrand, Björn, et al ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dahlstrand, Björn, et al ABB AB Legal & Compliance/Intellectual Property 721 78 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [2003/19] | Dahlstrand, Björn, et al ABB Group Services Center AB Legal & Compliance/Intellectual Property 721 78 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Jenkler, Malte, et al Asea Brown Boveri AB Patent Stockholm Office 120 86 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00921273.9 | 30.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000SE00616 | Priority number, date | SE19990001201 | 01.04.1999 Original published format: SE 9901201 | [2002/01] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0060621 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1166300 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166300 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/12 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H01H3/022 (EP,US);
H01H11/0006 (EP,US);
H01H13/023 (EP,US);
H01H2003/024 (EP,US);
H01H2003/0246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSCHALTER | [2002/01] | English: | SAFETY SWITCH | [2002/01] | French: | COMMUTATEUR DE PROTECTION | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2001 | Translation filed | 10.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 24.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.01.2008 | BE | 30.01.2008 | CH | 30.01.2008 | CY | 30.01.2008 | DK | 30.01.2008 | FI | 30.01.2008 | LI | 30.01.2008 | NL | 30.01.2008 | LU | 30.03.2008 | IE | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | GB | 30.04.2008 | SE | 30.04.2008 | GR | 01.05.2008 | ES | 11.05.2008 | PT | 30.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
LU | 30.03.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
GB | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
GB | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
GB | 30.04.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
IE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 30.01.2008 | |
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5055643 (PARDINI FRANCO [IT], et al); | [A]US5180050 (RADA MARK Z [US], et al) |