EP1180178 - COMBINED SINK AND COOKING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/08] | COOKING SINK | ||
[2007/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOHLER CO. 444 Highland Drive Kohler, WI 53044 / US | [2007/44] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states KOHLER CO. 444 Highland Drive Kohler, Wisconsin 53044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REID, Mary, J. 204 Beach Court Sheboygan, WI 53081 / US | 02 /
O'CONNELL, David, J. 2604 North 7th Street Sheboygan, WI 53083 / US | 03 /
MUELLER, Carl, F. N3132 State Road 32 Sheboygan Falls, WI 53085 / US | 04 /
QUELLA, John, F. 625 Roosevelt Road Kohler, WI 53044 / US | 05 /
JOHANSEN, Mark 530 West Riverside Drive Kohler, WI 53044 / US | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00921497.4 | 29.03.2000 | [2002/08] | WO2000US08321 | Priority number, date | US19990126795P | 30.03.1999 Original published format: US 126795 P | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0058572 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180178 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180178 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.10.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/184, A47B77/08 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
E03C1/186 (EP,US);
A47B77/02 (EP,US);
A47J27/004 (EP,US);
A47J47/00 (EP,US);
A47J47/005 (EP,US);
A47J47/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/08] | E03C1/186 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜCHENSPÜLE MIT KOCHRAUM | [2002/08] | English: | COMBINED SINK AND COOKING UNIT | [2007/20] | French: | EVIER AVEC CHAMBRE DE CUISSON | [2002/08] |
Former [2002/08] | COOKING SINK | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/08] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06022646.1 / EP1776898 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.03.2008 | [2011/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3608473 (KEARN JOSEPH J, et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 1, line 44 - line 47; figures 1,4,5 * * column 1, line 73 - column 2, line 7 *; | [A]US4287818 (MOORE LEWIS F, et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 57 - line 60 * | International search | [A]US3627396 (MILLER LESTER D); | [A]US3915529 (BERNIER EDGAR R) |