EP1592553 - POLYOLEFIN FILM WITH EMBOSSED SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Oil Corporation 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIGLIORINI, Robert, A. 26 Jennifer Drive North Haven, Connecticut 06473 / US | 02 /
NOTHNAGLE, Christopher 89 Waterford Way Fairport, NY 14450-9749 / US | 03 /
PELLINGRA, Salvatore, J., Jr. 11918 Orchard Street Wolcott, NY 14590-1013 / US | [2005/51] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
MIGLIORINI, Robert, A. 303 Meadowlark Lane Victor, NY 14564 / US | ||
02 /
NOTHNAGLE, Christopher 89 Waterford Way Fairport, NY 14450-9749 / US | |||
03 /
PELLINGRA, Salvatore, J., Jr. 11918 Orchard Street Wolcott, NY 14590-1013 / US | Representative(s) | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 00921527.8 | 30.03.2000 | [2005/45] | WO2000US08471 | Priority number, date | US19990280475 | 30.03.1999 Original published format: US 280475 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0058090 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592553 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, C08J5/00, G03H1/02 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
B29C59/026 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B38/06 (US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C59/08 (EP,US);
B29C59/10 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0092 (US);
B32B2255/10 (US);
B32B2255/205 (US);
B32B2310/14 (US);
B32B2323/043 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/45] | Title | German: | POLYOLEFINFOLIE MIT GEPRÄGTER OBERFLÄCHE | [2005/45] | English: | POLYOLEFIN FILM WITH EMBOSSED SURFACE | [2005/45] | French: | FILM DE POLYOLEFINE POSSEDANT UNE SURFACE GAUFREE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 01.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.07.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   03.08.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3973063 (CLAYTON WILLIAM JOSEPH) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 4 * * claim 1 *; | [XY]EP0641647 (GUNZE KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,9 * page 2, line 37 - page 4, line 37 * * page 5, line 45 - line 48 * * page 6, line 54 - page 7, line 5 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US5501905 (KRALLMANN ANTON [DE], et al) [Y] 4,5* column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 63 * |