EP1204887 - METHOD FOR RADIAL PROFILING OF RESISTIVITY AT MULTIPLE DEPTHS OF INVESTIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. 4100 Clinton Drive Building 1, 6th Floor Houston Texas 77020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 4100 Clinton Drive, Building 1, 6th Floor Houston, Texas 77020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIWARA, Teruhiko 9415 Bassoon Drive Houston, TX 77025 / US | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00923148.1 | 07.04.2000 | [2002/20] | WO2000US09162 | Priority number, date | US19990337601 | 21.06.1999 Original published format: US 337601 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079306 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204887 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/18, G01V3/30, G01V3/38 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
G01V3/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM RADIALEN PROFILIEREN VOM WIDERSTAND AUF MEHRFACHEN VERMESSUNGSTIEFEN | [2002/20] | English: | METHOD FOR RADIAL PROFILING OF RESISTIVITY AT MULTIPLE DEPTHS OF INVESTIGATION | [2002/20] | French: | PROCEDE D'ETABLISSEMENT DU PROFIL DE RESISTIVITE RADIALE A DES PROFONDEURS D'INVESTIGATION MULTIPLES | [2002/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5448171 (CHEMALI ROLAND E [US], et al) [Y] 1-48 * column 1, line 29 - line 36 * * column 1, line 57 - line 61 * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 4 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5594343 (CLARK BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1,12,24,35* figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0793119 (ANADRILL INT SA [PA], et al) [Y] 1-48 * column 2, line 4 - line 17 * * column 4, line 35 - line 57 * * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A] - JONES V.L., "Extrapolation and interpolation formulae adaptable to desk and other types of digital computers", GEOPHYSICS, (19561001), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 1047 - 1054, XP002242488 [A] 1-48 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1438298 | International search | [A]US4899112 (CLARK BRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US5389881 (BITTAR MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [A]US5448171 (CHEMALI ROLAND E [US], et al); | [A]US5469062 (THOMPSON LARRY W [US], et al); | [A]US5594343 (CLARK BRIAN [US], et al) |