EP1092006 - CELLULASE DETERGENT MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2001/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINETZKY, Deborah 1057 Shell Boulevard, 7 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Kiddle, Simon John Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00923248.9 | 12.04.2000 | [2001/16] | WO2000US09666 | Priority number, date | US19990302035 | 29.04.1999 Original published format: US 302035 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066696 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092006 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092006 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C11D3/075, C11D3/10 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D3/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/10 (EP,US);
C11D3/38645 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [2003/43] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CELLULASE ENTHALTENDE WASCHMITTELMATRIX | [2001/16] | English: | CELLULASE DETERGENT MATRIX | [2001/16] | French: | MATRICE DETERGENTE A BASE DE CELLULASE | [2001/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 13.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Request for further processing for: | 31.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0271004 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,14 * page 10, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; example 5 * [A] 7-9; | [XA]EP0365103 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * examples 1,2,4A * [A] 3,4,6-9,14; | [XA]WO9808926 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 59, paragraph 5; examples 3II-3IV,9,10 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]WO9807821 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 12, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; examples 4I,5I,5III * * page 57, paragraph 2; examples 4I,5I,5III,6III,7,11III,11IV,12 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]WO9730143 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 47, paragraph 3; examples 4I,10,1 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]EP0495554 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 53 - line 57; examples I,IV; claims 1,5,12 * [A] 3-9,14; | [XA]WO9902637 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-9,14; | [XA]WO9817769 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 5, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 37, paragraph 4; examples 2G,3J,3L,6X,8,9HH-9JJ * [A] 3-9,14; | [XA]WO9801521 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 20, paragraph 4 - page 21, paragraph 1; examples A2-A6,B7-B12 * [A] 3-9,14; | [XA]WO9900478 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 14 - line 35; table I * [A] 3,5-10,14; | [XA]GB2330588 (LIN CHENG WEN [TW]) [X] 1,2 * example 2 * [A] 3,5-9,14; | [XA]GB2307695 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2 * example 8 * [A] 3,4,7-9,14; | [XA]WO9736985 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 4 - line 12; example - * [A] 3-9; | [XA]WO9743381 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 9, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 4 * * page 51, paragraph 3; examples 7,8 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]EP0709452 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 4 - line 44; examples 9,10 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]EP0679714 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 1 * * page 16, line 48 - line 52; table III * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]EP0633311 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 29 - line 38; example - * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]EP0540784 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 45 - line 50; examples VII,VIII; claims 1,3,5,12 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]WO9845396 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 12, line 10 - line 18; table 1 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]WO9720025 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * examples 1,8; claims 1,6 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]WO9616153 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * page 14, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * page 26, paragraph 5 - page 27, paragraph 1; example 11I * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]WO9311215 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * example -; claims 1,4,7 * [A] 3-10,14; | [XA]EP0495257 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 39 - line 44; examples V,X; claims 11,18 * [A] 3-9,14; | [DXA]EP0269169 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [DX] 1,2 * page 2, line 36 - line 45; example I * [A] 3-9,14; | [XA]EP0120528 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 11; examples IA,IB,ID,IE * [A] 3-9,14; | [XA]EP0173397 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2 * example II * [A] 3,7-9,12,14; | [DXA]GB2094826 (KAO CORP) [DX] 1,2 * examples 3,4; claim 1 * [A] 3-8,14; | [DXA]GB2095275 (KAO CORP) [DX] 1,2 * examples 2-4; claims 1,3 * [A] 3,4,7-9,14; | [XA]WO9804663 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 35, line 36 - page 36, line 4; examples I,II; claims 1-5 * [A] 3,5-9,13,14; | [XA]WO9742294 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1 * examples VII-X,XV-XX,XXII; claims 1,14 * [A] 3,5-10,14; | [XA]WO9206154 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * example XV * [A] 3,7-10,14; | [XA]US5721205 (BARNABAS MARY VIJAYARANI [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 29; examples 4,7 * [A] 3,5-8,12,14; | [A]WO9002790 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [A] 1-11,14 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 4; claims 1,2,7,10; tables 4-6 *; | [A]WO9810136 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,7,8,14 * page 3, paragraph 2; example 1 * |