EP1175386 - PRODUCTION OF PHENOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Oil Corporation 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVIN, Doron 88 Westchester Terrace Annandale, NJ 08801 / US | 02 /
SANTIESREBAN, Jose, G. 19218 Troon Court Baton Rouge, LA 70810 / US | 03 /
VARTULI, James, C. 89 Bartlett Drive Schenksville, PA 19473 / US | [2003/46] |
Former [2002/12] | 01 /
LEVIN, Doron 88 Westchester Terrace Annandale, NJ 08801 / US | ||
02 /
SANTIESREBAN, Jose, G. 191 Applegate Drive West Chester, PA 19382 / US | |||
03 /
VARTULI, James, C. 89 Bartlett Drive Schenksville, PA 19473 / US | |||
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
LEVIN, Doron Apt. D2, 125 Montgomery Avenue Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 / US | ||
02 /
SANTIESREBAN, Jose, G. 191 Applegate Drive West Chester, PA 19382 / US | |||
03 /
VARTULI, James, C. 1346 Morstein Road West Chester, PA 19380 / US | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 00923318.0 | 13.04.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000US09938 | Priority number, date | US19990296852 | 22.04.1999 Original published format: US 296852 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064849 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175386 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175386 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/53, C07C49/08, C07C37/08, C07C39/04, B01J27/053 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
C07C37/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01J27/053 (EP,US);
C07C45/53 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/08, C07C39/04 (US,EP);
C07C45/53, C07C49/08 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHENOLHERSTELLUNG | [2002/05] | English: | PRODUCTION OF PHENOL | [2002/05] | French: | PRODUCTION DE PHENOLS | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 20.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2003 | CH | 17.12.2003 | CY | 17.12.2003 | FI | 17.12.2003 | FR | 17.12.2003 | IT | 17.12.2003 | LI | 17.12.2003 | DK | 17.03.2004 | GR | 17.03.2004 | SE | 17.03.2004 | GB | 13.04.2004 | IE | 13.04.2004 | LU | 13.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | PT | 17.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
CY | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
FR | 17.12.2003 | ||
IT | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 13.04.2004 | ||
IE | 13.04.2004 | ||
LU | 13.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
CY | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
FR | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 13.04.2004 | ||
IE | 13.04.2004 | ||
LU | 13.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
FR | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 13.04.2004 | ||
IE | 13.04.2004 | ||
LU | 13.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 13.04.2004 | ||
IE | 13.04.2004 | ||
LU | 13.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 13.04.2004 | ||
LU | 13.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
LU | 13.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
CH | 17.12.2003 | ||
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
LI | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.03.2004 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 17.12.2003 | |
FI | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
SE | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 17.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4898995 (KNIFTON JOHN F [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5648590 (HSU CHAO-YANG [US], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document * |