EP1088368 - FLARED NOTCH RADIATOR ASSEMBLY AND ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 2000 E. El Segundo Boulevard P.O. Box 902 El Segundo California 90245-0902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 2000 E. El Segundo Boulevard, P.O. Box 902 El Segundo, California 90245-0902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEBE, Douglas, O. 1600 Goodman Avenue Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | 02 /
TSO, Lan 2118 Vanderbilt Ln, Apt. C Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | 03 /
BILLE, Jeffrey, M. 4706 Avenue C Torrance, CA 90505 / US | 04 /
CRANDALL, Gary, L. 8348 Kenyon Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | 05 /
WANG, Allen 8182 Mahogany Circle Buena Park, CA 90620 / US | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00923332.1 | 13.04.2000 | [2001/14] | WO2000US09970 | Priority number, date | US19990293145 | 16.04.1999 Original published format: US 293145 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064008 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088368 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088368 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/08 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H01Q13/085 (EP,US);
H01Q13/08 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP,US);
H01Q21/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/35] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG MIT GLOCKENFÖRMIGEN SCHLITZSTRAHLERN | [2001/14] | English: | FLARED NOTCH RADIATOR ASSEMBLY AND ANTENNA | [2001/14] | French: | ENSEMBLE ELEMENT RAYONNANT A FENTES ET ANTENNE | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 02.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.02.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Request for further processing for: | 05.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.08.2003 | IT | 27.08.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/08] | ES | 27.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0477951 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]US5185611 (BITTER JR CHARLES R [US]); | [A]EP0531800 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | US5264860 [ ] (QUAN CLIFTON [US]); | [A]US5461392 (MOTT CHARLES J [US], et al); | [A]US5502372 (QUAN CLIFTON [US]); | [A]US5519408 (SCHNETZER MICHEL W [US]); | [A]US5703599 (QUAN CLIFTON [US], et al); | [A]US5786792 (BELLUS PETER A [US], et al); | [A]US5812034 (YOSHIDA HARUO [JP]); | [A]US5825333 (KUDOH HIROSHI [JP], et al); |