EP1169243 - PACKAGE FOR SHEET DISPENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWLITSCHEK, Akim Bluecherstrasse 7A 41564 Kaaist / DE | 02 /
DUEMPELMANN, Dirk Am Entenpfuhl 3 D-50765 Nordrhein-Westfalen / DE | 03 /
KUNZE, Hansjuergen, J. Sulzbacher 40 D-65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 04 /
HOOPER, Jane, Ann 9722 Friar Tuck Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 05 /
GRUBSTEIN, Katherine, Yerre 2715 Markbreit Avenue, 1 Cincinnati, OH 45209 / US | 06 /
HERNANDEZ, Diego A. 7338 Overland Park Ct. West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 07 /
BURKETT, Timothy, Alan Paseo De La Herradura No. 303, Casa 62 Parques De La Herradura, Huixquilucan / MX | 08 /
LEWIS, Robert, Drennan 6114 Sugartree Court Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | 09 /
CASTILLEJOS, Enrique Elmo Acosta Encino Grande 129, Casa D Col Tetelpan, Mexico City / MX | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Kremer, Véronique, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 00923391.7 | 14.04.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000US10165 | Priority number, date | US19990129204P | 14.04.1999 Original published format: US 129204 P | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0061458 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1169243 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1169243 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/08, B65D75/20 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
B65D83/0805 (EP);
A47K2010/3266 (EP);
B65D2575/586 (EP);
B65D75/20 (EP);
B65D75/5827 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2003/25] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SPENDERPACKUNG FÜR BLATTMATERIAL | [2002/02] | English: | PACKAGE FOR SHEET DISPENSING | [2002/02] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR DISTRIBUTEUR DE FEUILLES | [2002/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2003 | BE | 18.06.2003 | CH | 18.06.2003 | CY | 18.06.2003 | FI | 18.06.2003 | IT | 18.06.2003 | LI | 18.06.2003 | NL | 18.06.2003 | DK | 18.09.2003 | GR | 18.09.2003 | PT | 18.09.2003 | SE | 18.09.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
CY | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
CH | 18.06.2003 | ||
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 18.06.2003 | |
LI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 18.06.2003 | |
LI | 18.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH361911 (BROWN SELWYN [GB]) [A] 1,3,8,10* page 5, line 97 - line 101; figure 4 *; | [DA]US4131195 (WORRELL SR ROBERT A) [DA] 1,2,4-6,8,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3691140 | US4131195 | US5725311 |