EP1196954 - VISIBLE LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE FORMED FROM WIDE BAND GAP SEMICONDUCTOR DOPED WITH A RARE EARTH ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF CINCINNATI 2624 Clifton Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45221-0623 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states University of Cincinnati 2624 Clifton Avenue Cincinnati, OH 452221-0623 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRKHAHN, Ronald, H. Emcore Corp., 145 Belmont Drive Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 02 /
CHAO, Liang-Chiun 112 Hanson Road Mississauga, Ontario L5B 2E4 / CA | 03 /
GARTER, Michael, J. 7891 Butler Warren Road West Chester OH 45069 / US | 04 /
STECKL, Andrew, J. 269 Sunny Acres Drive Cincinnati, OH 45255 / US | [2002/32] |
Former [2002/22] | 01 /
BIRKHAHN, Ronald, H. Emcore Corp., 145 Belmont Drive Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | ||
02 /
CHAO, Liang-Chiun 112 Hanson Road Mississauga, Ontario L5B 2E4 / CA | |||
03 /
GARTER, Michael, J. 3294 Glendora Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | |||
04 /
STECKL, Andrew, J. 269 Sunny Acres Drive Cincinnati, OH 45255 / US | |||
Former [2002/16] | 01 /
BIRKHAHN, Ronald, H. 1464 South Hampton Court Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US | ||
02 /
CHAO, Liang-Chiun 2930 Scioto Street 807 Cincinnati, OH 45219 / US | |||
03 /
GARTER, Michael, J. 3294 Glendora Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | |||
04 /
STECKL, Andrew, J. 269 Sunny Acres Drive Cincinnati, OH 45255 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00923427.9 | 17.04.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000US10283 | Priority number, date | US19990299186 | 23.04.1999 Original published format: US 299186 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0065666 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196954 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L31/0256, H01S5/32 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
H01L33/343 (EP,US);
H01L33/325 (EP,US);
H01S3/16 (EP,US);
H01L33/0033 (EP,US);
H01S3/1628 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEISSE LEUCHTDIODE BASIEREND AUF EINEM HALBLEITER MIT GROSSER BANDLÜCKE DOTIERT MIT EINEM SELTENERDEN-ELEMENT | [2002/16] | English: | VISIBLE LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE FORMED FROM WIDE BAND GAP SEMICONDUCTOR DOPED WITH A RARE EARTH ELEMENT | [2002/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF EMETTEUR DE LUMIERE VISIBLE, FORME A PARTIR D'UN SEMI-CONDUCTEUR A LARGE BANDE INTERDITE, DOPE A L'AIDE D'UN ELEMENT EN TERRES RARES | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5751021 (TERAGUCHI NOBUAKI [JP]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0517440 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * claim 1 * | [X] - HANSEN D M ET AL, "PHOTOLUMINESCENCE OF ERBIUM-IMPLANTED GAN AND IN SITU-DOPED GAN:ER", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19980309), vol. 72, no. 10, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1244 - 1246, XP002929491 [X] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.121034 | [X] - LOZYKOWSKI H J ET AL, "Visible cathodoluminescence of GaN doped with Dy, Er, and Tm", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19990222), vol. 74, no. 8, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1129 - 1131, XP012023305 [X] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.123465 | International search | [X]US5751021 (TERAGUCHI NOBUAKI [JP]); | [X] - HANSEN ET. AL., "Photoluminescence of erbium-implanted GaN and in situ-doped GaN: Er", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19980309), vol. 72, no. 10, pages 1244 - 1246, XP002929491 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.121034 | [X] - LOZYKOWSKI ET. AL., "Visible cathodoluminescence of GaN doped with Dy, Er and Tm", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19990222), vol. 74, no. 8, pages 1129 - 1131, XP002929492 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.123465 |