EP1171618 - PLANT TRANSFORMATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Samuel Roberts Noble Foundation 2510 Sam Noble Parkway Ardmore, OK 73402 / US | [2002/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRISON, Maria, J. HC60, Box 26A1 Ardmore, OK 73401 / US | 02 /
BURLIEGH, Stephen H., Ctr for Plant-Microbe Symb. Risoe National Laboratory, Building 330, Box 49 DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | 03 /
KARDAILSKY, Igor Plant Gene Expression Center, 800Buchanan St. Albany, CA 94710 / US | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/03] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00923550.8 | 20.04.2000 | [2002/03] | WO2000US10704 | Priority number, date | US19990130531P | 21.04.1999 Original published format: US 130531 P | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0063400 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1171618 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H1/00 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/8261 (EP);
C12N15/8205 (EP);
Y02A40/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PFLANZENTRANSFORMATION | [2002/03] | English: | PLANT TRANSFORMATION PROCESS | [2002/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFORMATION DE PLANTE | [2002/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 03.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX] - BECHTOLD N ET AL, "IN PLANTA AGROBACTERIUM-MEDIATED TRANSFORMATION OF ADULT ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA PLANTS BY VACUUM INFILTRATION", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY,US,HUMANA PRESS INC., CLIFTON, NJ, (1998), vol. 82, pages 259 - 266, XP000914126 [DX] 1-41 * the whole document * | [DX] - BECHTOLD N ET AL, "IN PLANTA AGROBACTERIUM MEDIATED GENE TRANSFER BY INFILTRATION OF ADULT ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA PLANTS", COMPTES RENDUS DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES. SERIE III: SCIENCES DE LA VIE,NL,ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, (1993), vol. 316, no. 10, ISSN 0764-4469, pages 1194 - 1199, XP000907460 [DX] 1-41 * the whole document * | [A] - TRIEU ANTHONY T ET AL, "Approaches to improve the efficiency of transformation and regeneration of Medicago truncatula", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, (19950729), vol. 108, no. 2 SUPPL, ISSN 0032-0889, page 57, XP002140335 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - TRIEU ANTHONY T ET AL, "Rapid transformation of Medicago truncatula: Regeneration via shoot organogenesis", BIOSIS, XP002140339 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1996), vol. 16, no. 1-2, pages 6 - 11 |