EP1272098 - BRAIN FUNCTION SCAN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW YORK UNIVERSITY 70 Washington Square South New York, NY 10012 / US | [2003/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHN, Erwin Roy 1010 Orienta Avenue Mamaroneck, NY 10543 / US | 02 /
JOHN, Michael Sasha 3560 Bathurst Street North York, Ontario M6A-2E1 / CA | [2011/36] |
Former [2003/02] | 01 /
JOHN, Erwin Roy 1010 Orienta Avenue Mamaroneck, NY 10543 / US | ||
02 /
JOHN, Michael Sasha 3560 Bathurst Street North York, Ontario M6A-2E1 / US | Representative(s) | Preuss, Udo Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Preuss, Udo Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Preuss, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00925993.8 | 14.04.2000 | [2003/02] | WO2000US10055 | Priority number, date | US19990447369 | 23.11.1999 Original published format: US 447369 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0137724 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272098 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272098 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/0476, A61B5/0484 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B5/372 (US);
A61B5/369 (EP);
A61B5/377 (EP);
A61B5/38 (US);
A61B5/383 (US);
A61B5/4076 (EP,US);
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
A61B5/407 (EP,US);
A61B5/7257 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/02] | Title | German: | GEHIRNFUNKTIONSSYSTEM | [2003/02] | English: | BRAIN FUNCTION SCAN SYSTEM | [2003/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE BALAYAGE DE LA FONCTION CEREBRALE | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 24.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10186280.3 / EP2272426 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2005 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.2002 | 03   M02   Fee paid on   03.06.2002 | 30.04.2009 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | IT | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | IE | 14.04.2012 | LU | 14.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 07.03.2012 | |
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3886314 (PORI JOHN R) [A] 1,8,14 * column 3, line 13 - line 17 * * column 3, line 53 - line 55 *; | [Y]US4201224 (JOHN E ROY [US]) [Y] 1,5,11 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 16 * * column 5, line 3 - line 6 * * column 9, line 15 - line 19 * * column 14, line 41 - line 53 *; | [Y]US5540235 (WILSON JOHN R [US]) [Y] 1,5,11 * column 1, line 27 - line 32 *; | [A]WO9624906 (JORDAN KENNETH G [US]) [A] 1,14* page 2, line 25 - line 31 *; | [A]US5699808 (JOHN ERWIN ROY [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 7, line 16 - line 25 *; | [A]WO9749077 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1,7,14 * page 7, line 5 - line 6 * * page 3, line 4 - line 7 * * page 4, line 20 - line 22 *; | [A]US5755230 (SCHMIDT ROBERT N [US], et al) [A] 1,11,13,14 * column 3, line 32 - line 37 *; | [YA]US6016444 (JOHN ERWIN ROY [US]) [Y] 1,5,11 * column 4, line 38 - line 40 * * column 8, line 42 - line 46 * * column 10, line 1 - line 30 * * column 11, line 16 - line 18 * [A] 2-4,9; | [A] - REULEN J P H ET AL, "Maastricht Cerebral Monitor (MCM) for the neonatal intensive care unit", J MED ENG TECHNOL;JOURNAL OF MEDICAL ENGINEERING & TECHNOLOGY JAN-FEB 1999 TAYLOR & FRANCIS LTD, LONDON, ENGL, (199901), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 29 - 37, XP008027292 [A] 1,12 * section "Asymmetry, mean and spectral edge frequency" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/030919099294410 | International search | [A]US5325862 (LEWIS GREGORY W [US], et al); | [A]US5746205 (VIRSU VEIJO [FI], et al); | [A]US5752922 (ROSENFELD J PETER [US]) | by applicant | US4279258 | US4846190 | US4913160 | US5029590 | US5083571 | US5287859 |