EP1171434 - TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINYL-INDOLE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | ||
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEWSHAW, Richard Eric Apartment B-509, 251 West DeKalb Pike King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
MEAGHER, Kristin Lynne Apartment L-8, 400 Dutch Neck Road Hightstown, NJ 08520 / US | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Mannion, Sally Kim Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Mannion, Sally Kim, Dr. c/o Wyeth Laboratories, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00926187.6 | 20.04.2000 | [2002/03] | WO2000US10647 | Priority number, date | US19990298041 | 22.04.1999 Original published format: US 298041 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064886 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1171434 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D401/08, A61K31/4725, A61P25/24 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP);
C07D401/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] | Extension states | AL | 17.09.2001 | LT | 17.09.2001 | LV | 17.09.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 17.09.2001 | SI | 17.09.2001 | Title | German: | TETRAHYDROISOCHINOLINYL-INDOLDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEPRESSION | [2002/03] | English: | TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINYL-INDOLE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION | [2002/03] | French: | DERIVES DE TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINYL-INDOLE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DEPRESSION | [2002/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 04.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9421628 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9424105 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [Y] 1-22 * page 29 - page 36 *; | [DA]WO9310092 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [DA] 1-22 * claim - * |