EP1175466 - COMPOSITION FOR PROVIDING AN ABRASION-RESISTANT COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SDC COATINGS, INC. 1911 Wright Circle Anaheim, CA 92806 / US | [2007/31] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states SDC COATINGS, INC. 1911 Wright Circle Anaheim, CA 92806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRY, Karl, W. 20502 Pebble Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92646 / US | 02 /
LEMBO, Bryan, S. 1433 Superior Avenue 318 Newport Beach, CA 92663 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2002/18] | 01 /
TERRY, Karl, W. 20502 Pebble Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92646 / US | ||
02 /
LEMBO, Bryan, S. 1433 Superior Avenue #318 Newport Beach, CA 92663 / US | |||
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
TERRY, Karl, W. 20502 Pebble Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92646 / US | ||
02 /
LEMBO, Bryan, S. 2200 Park Newport, 321 Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00926237.9 | 21.04.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000US10780 | Priority number, date | US19990130996P | 23.04.1999 Original published format: US 130996 P | US19990130768P | 23.04.1999 Original published format: US 130768 P | US19990130767P | 23.04.1999 Original published format: US 130767 P | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064992 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175466 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175466 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/06, C09D183/14, C08J7/04, G02B1/10 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
C09D183/06 (EP);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
C09D183/14 (EP);
G02B1/105 (EP);
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP);
C08K5/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/06, C08L2666/28, C08L2666/54 (EP);
C09D183/06, C08L2666/34, C08L2666/54 (EP);
C09D183/14, C08L2666/34, C08L2666/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ABRIEBFESTE BESCHICHTUNG | [2002/05] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PROVIDING AN ABRASION-RESISTANT COATING | [2002/05] | French: | COMPOSITION PRODUISANT UN REVETEMENT RESISTANT A L'ABRASION | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Request for further processing for: | 20.03.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | BE | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | LU | 21.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 01.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0407174 (SWEDLOW INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7,9-16,18-28,33,34 * claims 1-26 * * page 2, line 3 - line 8 * * page 4, line 3 - line 10 * * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 2 *; | [X]US5102695 (GUEST ALLEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9-16,18-28,33,34 * claims 1,2,6,7,17,27,28 *; | [A]EP0526975 (ITOH OPTICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-7 * * page 4, line 35 - line 38 *; | [A]US5367019 (SAWARAGI FUJIO [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [X]US5789082 (TREADWAY GERALD D [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1,6-10,14-16 *; | [X]WO9846692 (SDC COATINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-28,33-35 * claims 1-8,15 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 15 * | Examination | US4405679 | US5013788 | US5013608 | US5789476 |