EP1177224 - POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Lynda, Kaye 707 Burnley Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/06] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00926338.5 | 25.04.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US11047 | Priority number, date | US19990131552P | 29.04.1999 Original published format: US 131552 P | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066638 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177224 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177224 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/02, C08F4/70, C07C251/58, C07C251/24, C07F15/02, C07F15/06 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
C07F15/065 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07C251/24 (EP,US);
C07C251/58 (EP,US);
C07F15/02 (EP,US);
C07F15/025 (EP,US);
C07F15/06 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/7042 (US,EP);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/25] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETHYLENPOLYMERISATION | [2002/06] | English: | POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENE | [2002/06] | French: | POLYMERISATION D'ETHYLENE | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2004 | BE | 16.06.2004 | CH | 16.06.2004 | FI | 16.06.2004 | IT | 16.06.2004 | LI | 16.06.2004 | NL | 16.06.2004 | DK | 16.09.2004 | GR | 16.09.2004 | SE | 16.09.2004 | ES | 27.09.2004 | PT | 16.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
IT | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
NL | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/47] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
NL | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
LI | 16.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4416686 (MARTIN HENRY [CH]) [X] 7 * column 19; example 239 *; | [X] - PARK, M ET AL., "Molecular recognition : schiff base as molecular tweezers", MOL. CRYST. LIQ. CRYST. SCI. TECHNOL., (1999), vol. 337, pages 485 - 488, XP000934275 [X] 7 * page 486 : compound (I) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10587259908023483 | [XA] - BERTINI, IVANO ET AL, "Synthesis and proton magnetic resonance studies of paramagnetic nickel(II complexes containing benzaldimine groups. II. Five-coordinate complexes", INORG. CHEM. (1970), 9(4), 698-702, XP000915364 [X] 7 * page 698 * [A] 8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic50086a002 | [XA] - BOUWMAN, ELISABETH ET AL, "N,N'-bis(2-tert-butylthiobenzenylidene)-diethylenetriamine;its reactivit with nickel(II) salts", INORG. CHIM. ACTA (1999), 287(1), 105-108, (19990406), XP000900524 [X] 7 * page 106 * [A] 8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0020-1693(98)00406-X | [DA] - ROY, R. ET AL, "Metal complexes of sulfur-nitrogen chelating agents. Part 12. The chemistry of nickel(II), palladium(II), cobalt(II) and copper(II) complexes of N2S2 and N3S2 donor systems", TRANSITION MET. CHEM., (1984), vol. 9, pages 152 - 155, XP000934143 [DA] 7 * page 152 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00935932 |