EP1185565 - BIOADHESIVE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noveon IP Holdings Corp. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHANT, Nancy, S. 3362 Foskett Road Medina, OH 44256 / US | 02 /
YU, Simon, Hsaio-Pao 1812 Farr's Garden Path Westlake, OH 44145 / US | 03 /
AMJAD, Zahid 6709 Barkeigh Circle Brecksville, OH 44141 / US | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00926403.7 | 27.04.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000US11249 | Priority number, date | US19990314842 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: US 314842 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0069932 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185565 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185565 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/06, C09J133/02, C08F6/00 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
C08F220/06 (EP,US);
C08F6/12 (EP,US);
Y10S526/923 (EP,US);
Y10S526/93 (EP,US);
Y10S526/932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOADHESIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS POLYMEREN | [2002/11] | English: | BIOADHESIVE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [2002/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYMERES BIOADHESIVES | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2004 | BE | 14.04.2004 | CY | 14.04.2004 | FI | 14.04.2004 | LU | 27.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | ES | 25.07.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
CY | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LU | 27.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
LU | 27.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
BE | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4509949 (HUANG CHOR [US], et al) [X] 1-13,38 * example - * * claim - *; | [X]EP0371421 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [X] 1-14,37 * example - * * claim - *; | [X]EP0459373 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [X] 1-10,12,13,37 * example - * * claim - *; | [X]EP0676457 (GRAPHIC CONTROLS CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,12,13,37 * example - * * claim 6 *; | [X]US5608005 (SOJKA MILAN F [US]) [X] 1-13,43 * claim - *; | [A]US5674934 (SCHMIDT DONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-43* claim 6 * |