EP1173197 - METABOLIC INTERVENTION WITH GLP-1 TO IMPROVE THE FUNCTION OF ISCHEMIC AND REPERFUSED TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9373 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2011/42] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9373 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states BIONEBRASKA, INC. 3820 N.W. 46th Street Lincoln, NB 68524 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOLIDGE, Thomas, R. 3820 N.W. 46th Street Lincoln, NE 68524 / US | 02 /
EHLERS, Mario, R., W. 3820 N.W. 46th Street Lincoln, NE 68524 / US | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Taormino, Joseph Paul, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Taormino, Joseph Paul, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | von Menges, Albrecht Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00926404.5 | 27.04.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000US11251 | Priority number, date | US19990302596 | 30.04.1999 Original published format: US 302596 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0066138 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1173197 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173197 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1173197 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26, A61P9/10, // (A61K38/26, 31:7004),(A61K38/26, 31:7004, 33:00),(A61K38/26, 38:44),(A61K38/26, 38:06) | [2011/42] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,US);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/26, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/04] | A61K38/26, A61P9/10, // (A61K38/26, 31:7004),(A61K38/26, 31:7004, 33:00),(A61K38/26, 38:44),(A61K38/26, 38:06) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Title | German: | METABOLISCHE INTERVENTION MIT GLP-1 ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FUNKTION VON ISCHÄMISCHEM UND WIEDERDURCHBLUTETEM GEWEBE | [2002/04] | English: | METABOLIC INTERVENTION WITH GLP-1 TO IMPROVE THE FUNCTION OF ISCHEMIC AND REPERFUSED TISSUE | [2002/04] | French: | INTERVENTION METABOLIQUE AU MOYEN D'UN PEPTIDE 1 DU TYPE GUCAGON (GLP-1) PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER UNE LESION D'UN TISSU PROVOQUEE PAR UNE ISCHEMIE ET UNE REPERFUSION | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP04027507.5 / EP1512410 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2005
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponents representative Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.2005
ADMISSIBLE Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponents representative Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | 07.10.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.10.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.08.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.01.2008 | Appeal received No. T0163/08 | 13.03.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.10.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 06.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.10.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2013/51] | deleted | ||
Former [2013/29] | FI | 18.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4196196 (TIHOLIZ IVAN C [US]) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [Y]WO9415925 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [Y] 7 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 28 * * page 40, line 30 - page 41, line 9 * * page 43, line 28 - line 33 * * claims 7-12 *; | [XY]WO9808531 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1-4,8-17,19,20,22,23 * page 4, line 19 - line 34 * * page 17, line 26 - page 20, line 25 * * claims 1-13 * [Y] 5-7,18,21; | [A]WO9808873 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 21 * page 6, line 23 - line 28 * * page 20, line 23 - page 25, line 8 * * claims 1-13 *; | [YD] - APSTEIN CS, "Glucose-Insulin-Potassium for acute myocardial infarction; remarkable results from a new prospective, randomized trial", CIRCULATION, (19981124), vol. 98, pages 2223 - 2226, XP000960510 [YD] 5,6,18,21 * the whole document * | Opposition | EP0708179 | WO0016797 | - VOLL, C.L. ET AL., "Postischemic Insulin Reduces Spatial Learning Deficit Following Transient Forebrain Ischemia in Rats", STROKE, (1989), vol. 20, pages 646 - 651 | - DIAZ, R. ET AL., "Metabolic Modulation of Acute Myocardial Infarction - The ECLA Glucose-Insulin-Potassium Pilot Trial", CIRCULATION, (1998), vol. 98, pages 2227 - 2234 | - RYAN, T. J. ET AL., "ACC/AHA Guidelines for the Managment of Patients With Acute Myocardial Infarction", JACC, (19961101), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 1328 - 1428 |