EP1097611 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOM, Anton, C. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Bosma, Rudolphus Hubertus Antonius Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 00927084.4 | 27.04.2000 | [2001/19] | WO2000EP03803 | Priority number, date | EP19990201514 | 14.05.1999 Original published format: EP 99201514 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0070919 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097611 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097611 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/28, H02M1/00 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H02M1/4258 (EP,US);
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2001/19] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT | [2001/19] | French: | CIRCUIT | [2004/24] |
Former [2001/19] | MONTAGE DE CIRCUITS | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 04.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5331534 (SUZUKI SHIGESADA [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 50 - column 9, line 54; figures 2-9 *; | [A]DE19508468 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]); | [A]US5737207 (URATANI KAZUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5652480 (GROISS STEFAN [AT]) |