EP1409940 - METHOD OF CHARGING A PRESSURIZED CONTAINER WITH GRANULAR SOLIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outokumpu Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | [2004/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEPPE, Rüdiger Schottener Strasse 5 D-60435 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
KANSCHIK, Klaus Neuhof 69 D-45327 Essen / DE | 03 /
ORTH, Andreas Obere Römerhofstrasse 132 D-61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 00927112.3 | 29.04.2000 | [2004/17] | WO2000EP03895 | Priority number, date | DE19991050101 | 18.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19950101 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129496 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409940 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409940 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F27D3/00, F27D3/10, B65G53/46 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
F27D3/0033 (EP,US);
B01J3/02 (EP,US);
B01J8/003 (EP,US);
B01J8/0035 (EP,US);
B65G53/4691 (EP,US);
F27D2099/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINTRAGEN KÖRNIGER FESTSTOFFE IN EINEN UNTER ÜBERDRUCK STEHENDEN BEHÄLTER | [2004/17] | English: | METHOD OF CHARGING A PRESSURIZED CONTAINER WITH GRANULAR SOLIDS | [2004/17] | French: | PROCEDE D'INTRODUCTION DE MATIERES SOLIDES GRANULAIRES DANS DES CONTENEURS EN SURPRESSION | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 27.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | 30.08.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.08.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.05.2005 | FI | 18.05.2005 | GB | 18.05.2005 | IE | 18.05.2005 | IT | 18.05.2005 | NL | 18.05.2005 | DK | 18.08.2005 | GR | 18.08.2005 | SE | 18.08.2005 | PT | 24.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
GB | 18.05.2005 | ||
IE | 18.05.2005 | ||
IT | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
GB | 18.05.2005 | ||
IE | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
GB | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
GB | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
GB | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 18.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE338997 (OSCAR LEHMANN G); | [A]US2920793 (MUNSELL DAVID D); | [A]DE3311655 (KIENER PYROLYSE [DE]); | [A]US4627456 (BEVIER WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US4774896 (MICHIMAE KIYOHARU [JP], et al) |