EP1177185 - 4, 5, 6, 7-TETRAHYDROINDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AS ANTITUMOR AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia Italia S.p.A. Via Robert Koch 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | [2002/15] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEVARELLO, Paolo Piazza San Pietro in Ciel d'Oro, 7/A I-27100 Pavia / IT | 02 /
VILLA, Manuela Via San Bernardino, 12 I-22040 Lurago d'Erba / IT | 03 /
VARASI, Mario Via Giambellino, 80 I-20146 Milan / IT | 04 /
ISACCHI, Antonella Via Montecatini, 14 I-20144 Milan / IT | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00927184.2 | 04.05.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000EP04208 | Priority number, date | GB19990011053 | 12.05.1999 Original published format: GB 9911053 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0069846 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177185 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177185 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D231/56, A61K31/416, A61P35/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D231/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/416 (KR);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D213/38 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/16] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 21.11.2001 | LT | 21.11.2001 | LV | 21.11.2001 | MK | 21.11.2001 | RO | 21.11.2001 | SI | 21.11.2001 | Title | German: | 4, 5, 6, 7-TETRAHYDROINDAZOLDERIVATE ALS ANTITUMORMITTEL | [2002/06] | English: | 4, 5, 6, 7-TETRAHYDROINDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AS ANTITUMOR AGENTS | [2002/06] | French: | DERIVES DE 4,5,6,7-TETRAHYDROINDAZOLE UTILES COMME AGENTS ANTITUMORAUX | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4734430 (LE TOURNEAU MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 7 * example 2 *; | [A]WO9915500 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract *; | [A]WO9917769 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,13,14* claim 1 *; | [X] - SCHENONE, PIETRO ET AL, "Reaction of 2-dimethylaminomethylene-1,3-diones with dinucleophiles. I. Synthesis of 1,5-disubstituted 4-acylpyrazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 98:160635, URL: STN, XP002144430 [X] 7 * compound with RN=85302-12-1 * | [ ] - J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM. (1982), 19(6), 1355-61 | [X] - BIANCHI, GIORGIO ET AL, "Regioselectivity in the reactions of benzonitrile N-phenylimide and some benzonitrile N-oxides with.alpha.,.beta.-unsaturated ketones", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 95:97308, URL: STN, XP002144431 [X] 7,12 * compound with RN=77987-78-1 * | [ ] - J. CHEM. RES., SYNOP. (1981), (1), 6-7 | [X] - SLIEDE, J. ET AL, "Bromination of 1-phenyl-3,5,5-trimethyl-4-oxocyclopentapyrazole", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 87:23141, URL: STN, XP002144432 [X] 7,12 * compounds with RN=61330-33-4; 63077-20-3 * | [ ] - LATV. PSR ZINAT. AKAD. VESTIS, KIM. SER. (1977), (1), 112-13 | [X] - STRAKOV, A. YA. ET AL, "1-Phenyl-5,5-dimethyl- and 1-phenyl-3,5,5-trimethyl-4- hydroxycyclopentapyrazole-4-carboxylic acids and some of their reactions", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 86:29709, URL: STN, XP002144433 [X] 7 * compounds with RN=61330-32-3; 61330-33-4 * | [ ] - LATV. PSR ZINAT. AKAD. VESTIS, KIM. SER. (1976), (4), 469-70 | [X] - STRAKOV, A. YA. ET AL, "1-(1-Phthalazinyl)- and 1-(4-methoxyphenyl)-6,6-dimethyl-4-oxo- 4,5,6,7-tetrahydroindazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 125:300882, URL: STN, XP002144434 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=51300-52-8; 182744-31-6 * | [ ] - KHIM. GETEROTSIKL. SOEDIN. (1996), (5), 708-710 | [X] - STRAKOV, A. YA. ET AL, "Reaction of 2-amino- and 2-hydrazinobenzimidazoles with 2-acyldimedones", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 125:167869, URL: STN, XP002144435 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=180141-39-3; 180141-40-6 * | [ ] - KHIM. GETEROTSIKL. SOEDIN. (1996), (2), 247-252 | [X] - RUBINOV, D. B. ET AL, "Reaction of 2-acylcylohexane-1,3-diones with 6- hydrazinophenanthridine", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 119:117172, URL: STN, XP002144436 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=149430-94-4; 149430-95-5 * | [ ] - KHIM. GETEROTSIKL. SOEDIN. (1992), (12), 1617-20 | [X] - GUDRINIECE, E. ET AL, "1-Aryl-4-carboxy-5-(.beta.-methyl-.beta.-carboxypropyl)pyrazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 81:91415, URL: STN, XP002144437 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=16315-26-7; 21269-61-4 * | [ ] - DOKL. AKAD. NAUK SSSR (1974), 216(6), 1293-5 [(CHEM)] | [X] - NUNN, ARTHUR J. ET AL, "Semmler-Wolff aromatization and abnormal Beckmann and Schmidt reactions of 3-alkyl-4-oxo-1-phenyl-4,5,6,7-tetrahydroindazoles and their oximes in polyphosphoric acid", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 80:82796, URL: STN, XP002144438 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=51300-55-1; 21269-61-4; 51300-51-7;51300-54-0;51300-56-2; 51376-27-3; 51300-52-8 * | [ ] - J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 1 (1973), (22), 2697-703 | [X] - SUCROW, WOLFGANG ET AL, "Enehydrazines. 4. Reaction of dimedone with hydrazones", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 77:100891, URL: STN, XP002144439 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=38126-75-9; 38126-75-9; 38327-04-7; 38341-19-4 * | [ ] - CHEM. BER. (1972), 105(7), 2143-55 | [X] - STRAKOVA, I. A. ET AL, "Alkylation of 3-methyl-4-oxo-4,5,6,7-tetrahydroindazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 73:87837, URL: STN, XP002144440 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=16315-22-3; 28714-62-7; 28714-64-9;28714-70-7; 28714-63-8 * | [ ] - KHIM. GETEROTSIKL. SOEDIN. (1970), (4), 520-4 | [X] - STRAKOVA, I. A. ET AL, "Reduction of 1-phenyl-3-methyl-4-oxo-4,5,6,7-tetrahydroindazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 73:77133, URL: STN, XP002144441 [X] 7,9 * compound with RN=28795-07-5 * | [ ] - LATV. PSR ZINAT. AKAD. VESTIS, KIM. SER. (1969), (5), 574-8 | [X] - STRAKOVA, I. A. ET AL, "6-Substituted 3-methyl-4-hydroxy-4,5,6,7-tetrahydroindazoles", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 70:77862, URL: STN, XP002144442 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=21444-51-9; 21444-57-5 * | [ ] - LATV. PSR ZINAT. AKAD. VESTIS, KIM. SER. (1968), (6), 718-21 | [X] - STRAKOVA, I. A. ET AL, "3,6,6-Trimethyl-4,5,6,7-tetrahydro-4-indazoline derivatives", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 67:116848, URL: STN, XP002144443 [X] 7,8,12 * compounds with RN=163-16-5; 16315-17-6; 16315-18-7; 16315-19-8; 16315-22-3; 16315-26-7; 16342-78-2 * | [ ] - LATV. PSR ZINAT. AKAD. VESTIS, KIM. SER. (1966), (6), 680-3 | Examination | US3657270 | US3657438 | US3691180 |