EP1188125 - METHOD FOR INTEGRATING INTO AN APPLICATION OBJECTS THAT ARE PROVIDED OVER A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autodesk, Inc. 111 McInnis Parkway San Rafael California 94903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Autodesk, Inc. 111 McInnis Parkway San Rafael, California 94903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITTMAN, Michael Unit 201, 400 Spear Street San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Dendorfer, Claus, Dr. Wächtershäuser & Hartz Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00928745.9 | 02.05.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000US11962 | Priority number, date | US19990133228P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133228 P | US19990147872P | 09.08.1999 Original published format: US 147872 P | US19990154166P | 15.09.1999 Original published format: US 154166 P | US20000479606 | 06.01.2000 Original published format: US 479606 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0068822 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1188125 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188125 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
G06F16/95 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | GB [2003/11] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM INTEGRIEREN VON ÜBER EIN NETZWERK ZUR VERFÜGUNG GESTELLTEN OBJEKTEN IN EINE APPLIKATION | [2002/12] | English: | METHOD FOR INTEGRATING INTO AN APPLICATION OBJECTS THAT ARE PROVIDED OVER A NETWORK | [2002/12] | French: | INTEGRATION DANS UNE APPLICATION D'OBJETS TRANSMIS A TRAVERS UN RESEAU | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02016764.9 / EP1280073 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0895195 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,15,16,18-27,29-31,33,37,38,40-44 * page 11, lines 15-30; figure 9 * * page 11, line 55 - page 12, line 3 * * page 18, line 22 - page 19, line 1 *; | [X]US5815154 (HIRSCHTICK JON K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,11,15,23,24,27,30,33,37,38,40,41 * column 4, lines 48-61; figure 2 * * column 5, lines 43-58 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 6; figure 8 * * column 9, lines 16-24 * * column 14, lines 43-60 *; | [A]WO9833127 (MESA SYSTEMS GUILD INC [US]) [A] 1-44 * abstract * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 14; claims 1-4,9,10,12,13 *; | [X] - NOUSCH M ET AL, "CAD on the World Wide Web: virtual assembly of furniture with BEAVER", PROCEEDINGS VRML 99. FOURTH SYMPOSIUM ON THE VIRTUAL REALITY MODELING LANGUAGE, PROCEEDINGS OF VIRTUAL REALITY MODELING LANGUAGE 1999, PADERBORN, GERMANY, 23-26 FEB. 1999, 1999, New York, NY, USA, ACM, USA, ISBN 1-58113-079-1, pages 113 - 119, XP002172203 [X] 1-44 * page 114, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/299246.299283 | [A] - REGLI W C, "Internet-enabled computer aided design", IEEE INTERNET COMPUTING, JAN.-FEB. 1997, IEEE, USA, vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1089-7801, pages 39 - 50, XP002172204 [A] 1-44 * page 40, column R, line 3 - page 41, column L, line 27 * * page 42, column L, lines 10-20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4236.585171 |