EP1198532 - DIELECTRIC MATERIAL INCLUDING PARTICULATE FILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TPL, Inc. 3912 Academy Parkway North, Northeast Alberquerque, NM 87109-4416 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states TPL, Inc. 3912 Academy Parkway North, Northeast Alberquerque, NM 87109-4416 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMAN, William, F. 9710 Tanoan Drive, N.E. Albuquerque, NM 87111 / US | 02 /
SLENES, Kirk, M. 6812 Lamar Avenue, N.W. Albuquerque, NM 87120 / US | 03 /
LAW, Kristen, J. 5140 Roanoke Avenue, N.W. Albuquerque, NM 87120 / US | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Kupecz, Arpad, et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Kupecz, A., Drs. c.s., et al Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Weteringschans 96 1017 XS Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 00928757.4 | 03.05.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000US12002 | Priority number, date | US19990305253 | 04.05.1999 Original published format: US 305253 | US19990458363 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: US 458363 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066674 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198532 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/16, C01G23/00, C04B35/468, H01G4/12, B32B15/08 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
B32B27/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/18 (US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
B32B2311/18 (US);
B32B2457/16 (US);
H05K2201/0209 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0257 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0317 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/17] | C09J5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIELEKTRISCHES MATERIAL ENTHALTEND EINEN TEILCHENFÖRMIGEN FÜLLSTOFF | [2002/17] | English: | DIELECTRIC MATERIAL INCLUDING PARTICULATE FILLER | [2002/17] | French: | MATIERE DIELECTRIQUE RENFERMANT UNE CHARGE PARTICULAIRE | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 19.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0730257 ; | [X]US2803553 (OSHRY HOWARD I) [X] 1,4-9 * column 2, line 32 - line 43; figures 2,3; claims 1-6 *; | [L]US4536451 (SHEN JOHN C S [US]) [L] 10 * column 3, line 11 - line 28 ** column 4, line 35 - line 57 *; | [A]US4832939 (MENASHI JAMEEL [US], et al) [A] 4-9 * column 1, line 37 - column 5, line 6 * * column 15, line 51 - column 17, line 8 *; | [A]EP0641740 (CHON INT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 4-9 * page 2, line 16 - line 32 * * figures 3,9; examples 1-11,15-19 *; | [X]US5445806 (KINUGASA MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 4-9 * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 68 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 23 * * examples 1-5 *; | [X]WO9821272 (HOLL RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1,10 * page 7, line 4 - line 31 * * page 19, line 4 - page 21, line 35 * * page 26, line 12 - line 36 *; | [X]WO9835920 (CABOT CORP [US]) [X] 4-10,1-3 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 17 * * page 7, line 10 - page 14, line 24 * * page 18, line 4 - line 10 * * page 19, line 16 - page 21, line 25; example 1 * * example 8 *; | [X]US5800575 (LUCAS GREGORY L [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 12 - column 3, line 32 * * column 4, line 9 - column 9, line 23 * * column 12, line 25 - column 16, line 42 *; | [XA]EP0902048 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 12 * * page 4, line 58 - page 6, line 41 * * examples 22-27 * [A] 4-10; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07030257 A 19950131 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * page 3, column 4, paragraph 20 - paragraph 25; figures 1-1,1-2 * | [A] - CHO W-S ET AL, "Synthesis of ultrafine BaTiO3 particles from polymeric precursor: their structure and surface property", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (19980220), vol. 266, no. 1-2, ISSN 0925-8388, pages 118 - 122, XP004121924 [A] 4-9 * page 121, line 5 - line 11 * * Conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-8388(97)00446-5 | International search | [Y]US4087300 (ADLER EDWARD); | [Y]US4764493 (LILLEY EDWARD [US], et al); | [X]US5162977 (PAURUS FLOYD G [US], et al); | [Y]US5172304 (OZAWA JYUICHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US5796587 (LAUFFER JOHN M [US], et al) |