EP1181241 - AUTOTHERMAL REFORMING SYSTEM WITH INTEGRATED SHIFT BEDS, PREFERENTIAL OXIDATIONREACTOR, AUXILIARY REACTOR, AND SYSTEM CONTROLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuvera Fuel Cells 15 Acorn Park Cambridge, MA 02140-2390 / US | [2002/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTLEY, Jeffrey M. 20 Landmark Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
BLOCK, Stephen Gustav 27 Nichewaug Road Petersham, MA 01366 / US | 03 /
BOWERS, Brian 5 Craigie Circle, Apartment No.28 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 04 /
CHINTAWAR, Prashant S. 58 Spencer Road Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | 05 /
CLAWSON, Lawrence G. 7 Rocky Brook Road Dover, MA 02030 / US | 06 /
CROSS, James C., III 96 County Road Ipswich, MA 01938 / US | 07 /
DAVIS, Robert 25 Lode Avenue, Waterbeach Cambridge CB5 9PX / GB | 08 /
DORSON, Matthew H. 28 Peel Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 09 /
HAGAN, Mark R. 103 Liberty Avenue, Apt No.1 Somerville, MA 02144 / US | 10 /
KLEEBERG, Gunther 46 Eastern Avenue Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 11 /
MITCHELL, William L. 111 Oakley Road Belmont, MA 02178 / US | 12 /
MORRISEAU, Brian D. 400 West Cumming Park Woburn, MA 01801 / US | 13 /
NOWICKI, Brian J. 44 Capitol Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 14 /
PAPILE, Christopher 7 Bartlett Avenue, Apartment No.2 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 15 /
POLLICA, Darryl 25 Appleton Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 16 /
PRABHU, Srinivasa 11 Linden Avenue Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 17 /
QI, Frank C. 65 Bartwell Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 18 /
RIZZO, Vincent G. 32 Pleasant Drive, Apartment No.14 Stoughton, MA 02072 / US | 19 /
RUMSEY, Jennifer W. 32 Paul Revere Road Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 20 /
SUN, Maria W. 85 Green Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | 21 /
THIJSSEN, Johannes 1 Richdale Avenue, No.2 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 22 /
THOMPSON, Craig 16 Clinton Street, Apt. 2 Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | [2005/14] |
Former [2002/09] | 01 /
BENTLEY, Jeffrey M. 20 Landmark Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | ||
02 /
BLOCK, Stephen Gustav 27 Nichewaug Road Petersham, MA 01366 / US | |||
03 /
BOWERS, Brian 5 Craigie Circle, Apartment No.28 Cambridge, MA 01238 / US | |||
04 /
CHINTAWAR, Prashant S. 58 Spencer Road Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | |||
05 /
CLAWSON, Lawrence G. 7 Rocky Brook Road Dover, MA 02030 / US | |||
06 /
CROSS, James C., III 96 County Road Ipswich, MA 01938 / US | |||
07 /
DAVIS, Robert 25 Lode Avenue, Waterbeach Cambridge CB5 9PX / GB | |||
08 /
DORSON, Matthew H. 28 Peel Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
09 /
HAGAN, Mark R. 103 Liberty Avenue, Apt No.1 Somerville, MA 02144 / US | |||
10 /
KLEEBERG, Gunther 46 Eastern Avenue Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
11 /
MITCHELL, William L. 111 Oakley Road Belmont, MA 02178 / US | |||
12 /
MORRISEAU, Brian D. 400 West Cumming Park Woburn, MA 01801 / US | |||
13 /
NOWICKI, Brian J. 44 Capitol Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | |||
14 /
PAPILE, Christopher 7 Bartlett Avenue, Apartment No.2 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
15 /
POLLICA, Darryl 25 Appleton Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
16 /
PRABHU, Srinivasa 11 Linden Avenue Somerville, MA 02143 / US | |||
17 /
QI, Frank C. 65 Bartwell Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
18 /
RIZZO, Vincent G. 32 Pleasant Drive, Apartment No.14 Stoughton, MA 02072 / US | |||
19 /
RUMSEY, Jennifer W. 32 Paul Revere Road Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
20 /
SUN, Maria W. 85 Green Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
21 /
THIJSSEN, Johannes 1 Richdale Avenue, No.2 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | |||
22 /
THOMPSON, Craig 16 Clinton Street, Apt. 2 Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | Representative(s) | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester, M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Collingwood, Anthony Robert, et al McNeight & Lawrence, Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport, Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00928795.4 | 03.05.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000US12117 | Priority number, date | US19990132184P | 03.05.1999 Original published format: US 132184 P | US19990132259P | 03.05.1999 Original published format: US 132259 P | US20000563677 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: US 563677 | US20000565288 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: US 565288 | US20000563676 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: US 563676 | US20000562787 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: US 562787 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066487 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181241 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181241 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/48 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
H01M8/0631 (EP);
B01J8/0419 (EP);
B01J8/0496 (EP);
C01B3/36 (EP);
C01B3/38 (EP);
C01B3/382 (EP);
C01B3/386 (EP);
C01B3/48 (EP);
C01B3/583 (EP);
H01M8/0612 (EP);
B01J2208/00044 (EP);
B01J2208/0007 (EP);
B01J2208/00203 (EP);
B01J2208/00495 (EP);
B01J2208/0061 (EP);
B01J2219/00006 (EP);
C01B2203/0233 (EP);
C01B2203/0244 (EP);
C01B2203/0255 (EP);
C01B2203/0261 (EP);
C01B2203/0288 (EP);
C01B2203/044 (EP);
C01B2203/045 (EP);
C01B2203/047 (EP);
C01B2203/0485 (EP);
C01B2203/0495 (EP);
C01B2203/066 (EP);
C01B2203/0811 (EP);
C01B2203/0833 (EP);
C01B2203/0844 (EP);
C01B2203/0866 (EP);
C01B2203/0872 (EP);
C01B2203/0883 (EP);
C01B2203/0894 (EP);
C01B2203/1011 (EP);
C01B2203/1023 (EP);
C01B2203/1041 (EP);
C01B2203/1047 (EP);
C01B2203/1052 (EP);
C01B2203/1058 (EP);
C01B2203/1064 (EP);
C01B2203/1076 (EP);
C01B2203/1082 (EP);
C01B2203/1229 (EP);
C01B2203/1241 (EP);
C01B2203/1247 (EP);
C01B2203/127 (EP);
C01B2203/1276 (EP);
C01B2203/1282 (EP);
C01B2203/1288 (EP);
C01B2203/1294 (EP);
C01B2203/141 (EP);
C01B2203/142 (EP);
C01B2203/143 (EP);
C01B2203/146 (EP);
C01B2203/147 (EP);
C01B2203/148 (EP);
C01B2203/1604 (EP);
C01B2203/1609 (EP);
C01B2203/1619 (EP);
C01B2203/1623 (EP);
C01B2203/1633 (EP);
C01B2203/1638 (EP);
C01B2203/1652 (EP);
C01B2203/1661 (EP);
C01B2203/1676 (EP);
C01B2203/1685 (EP);
C01B2203/169 (EP);
C01B2203/1695 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOTHERMEN DAMPFREFORMIERUNGSYSTEM MIT INTEGRIERTEN SHIFT BETTEN , REAKTOR FÜR PRÄFERENTIELLE OXIDATION ,HILFSREAKTOR UND SYSTEMSTEUERUNGEN | [2002/09] | English: | AUTOTHERMAL REFORMING SYSTEM WITH INTEGRATED SHIFT BEDS, PREFERENTIAL OXIDATIONREACTOR, AUXILIARY REACTOR, AND SYSTEM CONTROLS | [2002/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE REFORMAGE A LA VAPEUR AUTOTHERME AVEC DES LITS INTEGRES POUR L'OXYDATION SELECTIVE DE MONOXYDE DE CARBONE, REACTEUR POUR L'OXYDATION PREFERENTIELLE, REACTEUR D'APPOINT ET CONTROLES DE SYSTEMES. | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 12.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2005 | BE | 24.08.2005 | CH | 24.08.2005 | CY | 24.08.2005 | FI | 24.08.2005 | FR | 24.08.2005 | IT | 24.08.2005 | LI | 24.08.2005 | NL | 24.08.2005 | DK | 24.11.2005 | GR | 24.11.2005 | SE | 24.11.2005 | ES | 05.12.2005 | PT | 24.01.2006 | IE | 03.05.2006 | LU | 03.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
IT | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
LU | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
IT | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
DK | 24.11.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
BE | 24.08.2005 | ||
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
PT | 24.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
CH | 24.08.2005 | ||
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
LI | 24.08.2005 | ||
NL | 24.08.2005 | ||
GR | 24.11.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | ||
ES | 05.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.08.2005 | |
FI | 24.08.2005 | ||
SE | 24.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9808771 (LITTLE INC A [US]) [A] 1-283* page 6, line 21 - page 15, line 30 *; | [PA]EP0921585 (DBB FUEL CELL ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-283 * claim 1 * |