EP1126765 - FASTENER WITH SLIDER THEREON FOR USE IN MANUFACTURING RECLOSEABLE BAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2002 | Change - extension states | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pactiv Corporation 1900 West Field Court Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | [2001/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELMONT, Kirk, E. 70 Clarke's Crossing Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 02 /
BARCLAY, Ian, J. 3093 Parker Road Marion, NY 14505 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00928859.8 | 05.05.2000 | [2001/35] | WO2000US12302 | Priority number, date | US19990307843 | 10.05.1999 Original published format: US 307843 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067604 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126765 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/16, B65D33/00 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
B65B9/093 (EP,US);
A44B19/16 (KR);
B65B61/188 (EP,US);
B65D33/2541 (EP,KR,US);
B31B70/8131 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2514 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REISSVERSCHLUSS FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBAREM BEUTEL | [2001/35] | English: | FASTENER WITH SLIDER THEREON FOR USE IN MANUFACTURING RECLOSEABLE BAGS | [2001/35] | French: | FERMETURE A GLISSIERE DESTINEE A S'UTILISER DANS LA FABRICATION DE SACS POUVANT ETRE FERMES | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 13.06.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR1564039 ; | [Y]US4655862 (CHRISTOFF PAUL B [US], et al); | [Y]US4709398 (AUSNIT STEVEN [US]); | [Y]US4876842 (AUSNIT STEVEN [US]); | [Y]US4925316 (VAN ERDEN DONALD L [US], et al); | [Y]US5161286 (HERRINGTON JR F JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US5442838 (RICHARDSON DALE [US], et al); | [Y]US5669715 (DOBRESKI DAVID V [US], et al); | [Y]US5682730 (DOBRESKI DAVID V [US]); | [Y]US5833791 (BRYNIARSKI DAVID A [US], et al); | [Y]US5851070 (DOBRESKI DAVID V [US], et al); | [Y]US5896627 (CAPPEL CRAIG E [US], et al); | [YP]US5906438 (LAUDENBERG BERND [DE]); | [YP]US5924173 (DOBRESKI DAVID V [US], et al); | [YP]US5938337 (PROVAN ALEXANDER R [US], et al); | [YP]US5953796 (MCMAHON MICHAEL J [US], et al) |