EP1183063 - IMPROVED LUER FITTING INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbon Medical Technologies, Inc. 1290 Hammond Road St. Paul, MN 55110 / US | [2002/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Dean, A. 27 Raven Road North Oaks, MN 55127 / US | 02 /
BRAZIL, James, D. 1174 413th Avenue N.W. Braham, MN 55006 / US | 03 /
WHITE, Daniel, A. 2004 Runnymeade Court Minnetonka, MN 55305 / US | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00928930.7 | 09.05.2000 | [2002/10] | WO2000US12621 | Priority number, date | US19990309652 | 10.05.1999 Original published format: US 309652 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067833 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1183063 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/16, A61M25/18, A61M39/00, A61M39/10, A61M5/34 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
A61M25/0097 (EP,US);
A61M5/347 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/10] | A61M25/16, A61M25/18, A61M39/00, A61M39/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/10] | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT LUER-ANSCHLUSS | [2002/10] | English: | IMPROVED LUER FITTING INJECTOR | [2002/10] | French: | INJECTEUR A DISPOSITIF LUER PERFECTIONNE | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 08.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3638650 (BURKE GEORGE K, et al) [X] 1-3,12,16,18 * the whole document * [Y] 4-7,13-15,17,19; | [XY]US5643220 (COSME EDGAR Z [US]) [X] 1-3,12,16,18 * column 3, line 12 - column 3, line 29; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-7,13,14; | [X]WO9220389 (PARKIN ADRIAN [GB]) [X] 1-3,12,16,18 * page 7, line 9 - page 7, line 27; figures 3,5 *; | [Y]EP0838229 (DAIKYO SEIKO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-6,13,14 * page 1, line 29 - page 1, line 45; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US4346703 (DENNEHEY T MICHAEL, et al) [Y] 4-6,13,14 * column 8, line 37 - column 8, line 54; figures 14-16 *; | [Y]US5816804 (FISCHER DAN E [US]) [Y] 7,15,17,19 * column 5, line 15 - column 5, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [E]EP1051988 (SAF T MED INC [US]) [E] 1-4,12,16,18 * column 3, line 3 - column 3, line 9; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]US5441487 (VEDDER KENT B [US]); | [Y]US5785693 (HAINING MICHAEL L [US]); | [AE]US6063062 (PARADIS JOSEPH R [US]); | [A]US5743883 (VISCONTI PETER L [US]) |