EP1177293 - GROWTH FACTOR HOMOLOG ZVEGF4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILBERT, Teresa 246 12th Street Southeast Seattle, WA 98002 / US | 02 /
HART, Charles, E. 20114 183rd Place Northeast Woodinville, WA 98072 / US | 03 /
SHEPPARD, Paul, O. 13532 278th Drive Northeast Granite Falls, WA 98252 / US | 04 /
GILBERTSON, Debra, G. 4025 Northeast 195th Place Seattle, WA 98155 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00928993.5 | 03.05.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US40047 | Priority number, date | US19990304216 | 03.05.1999 Original published format: US 304216 | US19990164463P | 10.11.1999 Original published format: US 164463 P | US20000180169P | 04.02.2000 Original published format: US 180169 P | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066736 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177293 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C07K14/52, C07K16/22, C12Q1/68, A61K38/18 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
C07K14/52 (EP);
A61K38/1858 (EP);
A61K38/1866 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1858, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/1866, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WACHSTUMSFAKTORHOMOLOG ZVEGF4 | [2002/06] | English: | GROWTH FACTOR HOMOLOG ZVEGF4 | [2002/06] | French: | HOMOLOGUE DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE ZVEGF4 | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 07.12.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2007 | Observations by third parties | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2008 | Observations by third parties | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2009 | Observations by third parties | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9824811 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [A] 1-54* the whole document *; | [PX]WO9937671 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PX] 4-54 * the whole document *; | [EL]WO0034474 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [EL] 1-54 * the whole document * * seq. ID 37 * * L: priorities *; | [X] - STRAUSBERG R., "EST; H. sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:824754", GENBANK, (19970815), XP002144644 [X] 1-3,22,31-33,36-38,42 * encodes amino acids 305-370 of seq. ID 2. * | Examination | WO0027879 | other | WO0027879 |