EP1222630 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DITHERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALMSLEY, Simon, Robert Unit 3 9 Pembroke Street Epping, New South Wales 2121 / AU | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00929030.5 | 24.05.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000AU00514 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ00560 | 25.05.1999 Original published format: AU PQ056099 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0072261 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222630 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222630 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, H04N1/405, H04N1/52 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B41J3/36 (EP,KR,US);
B41J11/008 (EP,KR,US);
B41J13/02 (EP,KR,US);
B41J13/103 (EP,US);
B41J13/12 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (EP,US);
B41J2/155 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/16508 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/16579 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17503 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J23/02 (EP,US);
B41J29/02 (EP,US);
B41J29/023 (EP,US);
B41J29/393 (EP,US);
B41J3/44 (EP,US);
B41J3/445 (EP,US);
B41J3/46 (EP,US);
G03B15/05 (EP,US);
G03B17/02 (EP,US);
G03B17/50 (EP,US);
G03B29/00 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3232 (EP,US);
G07F17/3262 (EP,US);
H04N1/00249 (EP,US);
H04N1/00265 (EP,US);
H04N1/00278 (EP,US);
H04N1/00347 (EP,US);
H04N1/00397 (EP,US);
H04N1/00538 (EP,US);
H04N1/00541 (EP,US);
H04N1/00557 (EP,US);
H04N1/0083 (EP,US);
H04N1/00962 (EP,US);
H04N1/107 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N1/2154 (EP,US);
H04N1/32358 (EP,US);
H04N1/32598 (EP,US);
H04N1/387 (EP,US);
H04N1/405 (EP,US);
H04N1/52 (EP,US);
H04N1/60 (EP,US);
H04N1/6019 (EP,US);
H04N1/62 (EP,US);
H04N23/50 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
B41J19/207 (EP);
B41J2/17566 (EP,US);
G03B2215/05 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/001 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0081 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/29] | G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | 06.05.2002 | LT | 06.05.2002 | LV | 06.05.2002 | MK | 06.05.2002 | RO | 06.05.2002 | SI | 06.05.2002 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Dithering | [2007/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DITHERING | [2002/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif à technique de dithering | [2007/14] |
Former [2002/29] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALBTONZITTERN | ||
Former [2002/29] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE JUXTAPOSITION | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.03.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.08.2007 | BE | 22.08.2007 | CH | 22.08.2007 | CY | 22.08.2007 | DK | 22.08.2007 | FI | 22.08.2007 | LI | 22.08.2007 | NL | 22.08.2007 | SE | 22.11.2007 | DE | 23.11.2007 | GR | 23.11.2007 | ES | 03.12.2007 | PT | 22.01.2008 | FR | 18.04.2008 | LU | 24.05.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CY | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
DE | 23.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
LU | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
CY | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
DE | 23.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
DE | 23.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
PT | 22.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
BE | 22.08.2007 | ||
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
GR | 23.11.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 22.08.2007 | |
CH | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
LI | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 22.08.2007 | |
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 22.08.2007 | |
ES | 03.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 03.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4350996 (ROSENFELD GIDEON) [A] 9* column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 32 *; | [A]EP0357175 (ITEK GRAPHIX CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,5,9,10 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO9904368 (SILVERBROOK RESEARCH PTY LIMIT [AU], et al) |