EP1234279 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALMSLEY, Simon, Robert Unit 3, 9 Pembroke Street Epping, New South Wales 2121 / AU | 02 /
LAPSTUN, Paul 13 Duke Avenue Rodd Point, New South Wales 2046 / AU | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00929031.3 | 24.05.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000AU00515 | Priority number, date | AU1999PQ00560 | 25.05.1999 Original published format: AU PQ056099 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0072262 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1234279 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
B41J3/36 (EP,KR,US);
B41J11/008 (EP,KR,US);
B41J13/02 (EP,KR,US);
B41J13/103 (EP,US);
B41J13/12 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (EP,US);
B41J2/155 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/16508 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/16579 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17503 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J23/02 (EP,US);
B41J29/02 (EP,US);
B41J29/023 (EP,US);
B41J29/393 (EP,US);
B41J3/44 (EP,US);
B41J3/445 (EP,US);
B41J3/46 (EP,US);
G03B15/05 (EP,US);
G03B17/02 (EP,US);
G03B17/50 (EP,US);
G03B29/00 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3232 (EP,US);
G07F17/3262 (EP,US);
H04N1/00249 (EP,US);
H04N1/00265 (EP,US);
H04N1/00278 (EP,US);
H04N1/00347 (EP,US);
H04N1/00397 (EP,US);
H04N1/00538 (EP,US);
H04N1/00541 (EP,US);
H04N1/00557 (EP,US);
H04N1/0083 (EP,US);
H04N1/00962 (EP,US);
H04N1/107 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N1/2154 (EP,US);
H04N1/32358 (EP,US);
H04N1/32598 (EP,US);
H04N1/387 (EP,US);
H04N1/405 (EP,US);
H04N1/52 (EP,US);
H04N1/60 (EP,US);
H04N1/6019 (EP,US);
H04N1/62 (EP,US);
H04N23/50 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
B41J19/207 (EP);
B41J2/17566 (EP,US);
G03B2215/05 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/001 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | 06.05.2002 | LT | 06.05.2002 | LV | 06.05.2002 | MK | 06.05.2002 | RO | 06.05.2002 | SI | 06.05.2002 | Title | German: | METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR BILDAUFBEREITUNG | [2002/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE CONVERSION | [2002/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONVERSION D'IMAGE | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | 28.03.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.03.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   06.05.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4724395 (FREEMAN WILLIAM T [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - line 63 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 39 * * column 4, line 57 - column 6, line 6 *; | [A]US5373322 (LAROCHE CLAUDE A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - line 64 * * column 4, line 32 - column 7, line 2 *; | [A]EP0732859 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - line 31 * * page 3, line 20 - line 25 * * page 4, line 11 - page 7, line 34 *; | [A] - TOPFER K ET AL, "MODULATION TRANSFER FUNCTIONS AND ALIASING PATTERNS OF CFA INTERPOLATION ALGORITHMS", PROCEEDINGS. IS&T'S PICS CONFERENCE. ANNUAL CONFERENCE, PROCEEDINGS OF CONFERENCE OF THE SOCIETY FOR IMAGING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, XX, XX, (19980517), pages 367 - 370, XP008001895 [A] 1-14 * page 367, column L, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 367, column R, paragraph 2 - page 368, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 369, column R, paragraph 3 - page 370, column R, paragraph L * | [A] - OSTROMOUKHOV V ET AL, "ROTATED DISPERSED DITHER: A NEW TECHNIQUE FOR DIGITAL HALFTONING", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS. ANNUAL CONFERENCE SERIES. SIGGRAPH, XX, XX, (19940724), pages 123 - 130, XP008002227 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 124, column L, paragraph 5 - column R, paragraph L * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US5493335 (PARULSKI KENNETH A [US], et al); | [A]US5541653 (PETERS JOHN D [US], et al) |